Saraceni v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Ralph Saraceni
Defendant: Andrew M. Miller, Betsy S. Atkins, John A. Kelley, D. Scott Mercer, William A. Owens, Kevin T. Parker and Polycom, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv03880
Filed: August 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Consolidated cases C13-3880 SC and C13-4810 SC are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/3/15. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Deadline to file Second Amended Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 02/09/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part Defendants' motions to dismiss 48 , 51 and granting leave to amend. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 01/05/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/24/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Schedule on Defendants' Motions to dismiss. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 51 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT ANDREW M. MILLERS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED CONSOLIDATED FIRST AME NDED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, 48 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 8/8/2014. Replies due by 9/5/2014. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 07/10/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Filing of An Amended Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Response Thereto. Motions terminated: 37 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Shareholder Derivative Complai nt; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 03/27/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Setting Briefing Schedule. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/10/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER Consolidating C13-3880 SC and C13-4810 SC and Appointing Lead Counsel. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/31/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saraceni v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Saraceni
Represented By: Frank James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Miller
Represented By: Paul T. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy S. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Scott Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin T. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polycom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?