Matthew Enterprise, Inc. v. Chrysler Group LLC
Plaintiff: Matthew Enterprise, Inc.
Defendant: Chrysler Group LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv04236
Filed: September 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER DENYING 334 PLAINITFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/20/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER RE 242 , 243 , 244 , 246 , 248 , 249 , 250 , 251 , 252 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/21/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 179 DEFENDANT'S REVISED MOTION TO STRIKE NEW WORK PROFFERED BY EDWARD M. STOCKTON. Signed by Beth Labson Freeman on 8/3/2016. The caption has been modified to correct a clerical error. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 271 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Beth L. Freeman granting in part and denying in part 257 ; denying 260 ; granting 261 . (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER RE REDACTION OF ORDERS GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND TO EXCLUDE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER RE REDACTION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 201 202 203 204 205 206 207 208 209 210 211 212 213 214 PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/2/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part 172 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 192 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER DENYING 154 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO SERVE A SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT AND EXTEND THE EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part 131 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part 130 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING 111 DEFENDANT'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/27/2015. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER (1) GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; (2) MODIFYING the Court's prior dismissal of Plaintiff's Section 2(a) claims under the Robinson-Patman Act to be without prejudice. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/21/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 75 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 65 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant's Reply. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 61 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 55 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014).
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER adopting Proposed Case Schedule; ORDER VACATING September 4, 2014 Case Management Conference. Parties shall appear for Case Management Conference on January 15, 2015, at 1:30 P.M. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/14/2014.(blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freemandenying without prejudice 51 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2014 01:30 PM. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/12/2014 09:00 AM. Mediation session to commence within 30 days of court issuing its ruling on motion to dismiss. Parti es may appear at 09/04/2014 Case Management Conference without further approval of the court. Hearings to be held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman Courtroom #3, 5th Floor 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113. (Date Filed: 5/9/2014). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 05/09/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/21/2014. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Statement, the court has determined that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for January 24, 2014, is CONTINUED to May 30, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement on or before May 23, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/22/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND PAGE LIMITS filed by Matthew Enterprise, Inc., Chrysler Group LLC. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss : Response due by 12/13/2013, The response shall not exceed 30 pages of text. Replies due by 1/10/2014. The reply shall not exceed 20 pages of text. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/21/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Chrysler Group LLC. Response due 11/12/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/8/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthew Enterprise, Inc. v. Chrysler Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Enterprise, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Flanagan
Represented By: Katja M Grasso
Represented By: Gavin Michael Hughes
Represented By: Ali Kamarei
Represented By: Paul R Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Group LLC
Represented By: Scott M Abeles
Represented By: Robert Edmund Davies
Represented By: Sally Mae Handmaker
Represented By: Colin Kass
Represented By: Gregory Alexander Nelson
Represented By: Mary Alma Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?