Green v. Bimbo Bakeries USA
Plaintiff: Dan Green
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA
Case Number: 5:2013cv04414
Filed: September 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 8, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO FILE JCMS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 4, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 14, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE ADR AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 2, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 29, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 44 Motion for Summary Judgment (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
October 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 13, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order Continuing Settlement Conference Deadline, Hearing Date on Motion for Leave to Amend, and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/26/14. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Bimbo Bakeries USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Green
Represented By: Thomas E. Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?