Fevinger v. Bank of America , N.A.
Plaintiff: Rachel Fevinger
Defendant: Bank of America , N.A.
Case Number: 5:2013cv04839
Filed: October 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 CASE SCHEDULING ORDER re 93 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 15, 2015 (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER OF DISMISSAL RE NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 5, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART NATIONSTAR'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 73 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 66 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying as moot 45 Motion to Dismiss; granting 47 Motion for Leave to File (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/14/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 18 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fevinger v. Bank of America , N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America , N.A.
Represented By: Jamie Danielle Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Fevinger
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?