Garcia v. Dalton et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Garcia
Defendant: The Law Offices of Andrea Dalton LLP and Andrea Dalton
Case Number: 5:2013cv04849
Filed: October 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/18/2014 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/11/2014. If, however, a dismissal is filed before the hearing date, the Show Cause hearing will be automatically vacated and no statement will be required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/10/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 . Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/27/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 9 Motion to Change Venue (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 9 MOTION to Change Venue filed by The Law Offices of Andrea Dalton LLP, Andrea Dalton. Opposition papers due by 12/19/2013. Replies due by 12/31/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/6/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Dalton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Offices of Andrea Dalton LLP
Represented By: Gregory P. Arakawa
Represented By: Alicia Ryan Kennon
Represented By: Dennis B. Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Dalton
Represented By: Gregory P. Arakawa
Represented By: Alicia Ryan Kennon
Represented By: Dennis B. Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Garcia
Represented By: Steven Harris Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?