Torrey Point Group, LLC v. Razor, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Torrey Point Group, LLC
Defendant: Razor, Inc, Sago Networks, LLC, Matthew Kelly and John Zettlemoyer
Case Number: 5:2013cv05113
Filed: November 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh adopting 108 Report and Recommendation as to 104 Motion for Default Judgment. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/10/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 8, 2015 re 67 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 29 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 25 Motion for Leave to File.(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT SAGO NETWORKS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torrey Point Group, LLC v. Razor, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrey Point Group, LLC
Represented By: Carlton John Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razor, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sago Networks, LLC
Represented By: Catherine Schlomann Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Zettlemoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?