XimpleWare, Corp v. Versata Software, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: XimpleWare Corp
Defendant: Versata Software, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Ameriprise Financial, Inc., Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. and Aurea Software, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv05160
Filed: November 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/12/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER, Motions terminated: 131 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Ameriprise Financial, Inc., Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc.. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/12/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 102 121 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 110 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Dismiss (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 52 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED PRELIMINARY DISCOVERY 40 12 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Judge Illston's Standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XimpleWare, Corp v. Versata Software, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versata Software, Inc.
Represented By: Amir Alavi
Represented By: David C. Bohrer
Represented By: Benjamin Francis Foster
Represented By: Alisa Anne Lipski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trilogy Development Group, Inc.
Represented By: Amir Alavi
Represented By: David C. Bohrer
Represented By: Benjamin Francis Foster
Represented By: Alisa Anne Lipski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Financial, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Bohrer
Represented By: Case Collard
Represented By: Gregory Scot Tamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Bohrer
Represented By: Case Collard
Represented By: Gregory Scot Tamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurea Software, Inc.
Represented By: Amir Alavi
Represented By: David C. Bohrer
Represented By: Benjamin Francis Foster
Represented By: Alisa Anne Lipski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XimpleWare Corp
Represented By: Ansel Jay Halliburton
Represented By: Jack Russo
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?