Palana v. Mission Bay Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Horacio De Veyra Palana
Defendant: Mission Bay Inc. and Print It Here And Copy, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv05235
Filed: November 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND AWARD OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS 155 162 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/18/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER RE: AMENDED CLASS NOTICE 140 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPOINT CLASS COUNSEL 116 117 .(Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CLASS NOTICE by 3/18/16. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/15/2016) Modified on 3/15/2016 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' motion for leave to file third amended complaint 101 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER APPROVING CLASS NOTICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER RE: MOTION TO CLARIFY CLASS CERTIFICATION 91 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Settlement Conference set for 1/20/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER, Motions terminated: 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Print It Here And Copy, Inc., Mission Bay Inc.. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/16/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 61 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/29/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting stipulation for leave to file 2nd Amended Complaint., Motions terminated: 50 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Horacio De Veyra Palana.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/27/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 29 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting substitution of counsel. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/17/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT 18 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palana v. Mission Bay Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horacio De Veyra Palana
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Represented By: Phung Hoang Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Bay Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Print It Here And Copy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?