Banuelos v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Banuelos
Defendant: Old Republic Diversified Services, Inc and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv05308
Filed: November 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Benito
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Stipulated dismissal due by 10/15/2014. If dismissal not filed by that date, then Show Cause Response due by 10/21/2014 and parties to appear for Show Cause Hearing set for 10/28/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/25/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/9/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Sanctions. Counsel to appear in person at Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/6/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/29/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 18 defendant Old Republic Default Management Services' Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend; finding as moot 25 defendant's Motion to Appear by Telephone. 4/1/2014 motion hearing vacated. Amended pleading to be filed within 14 days from the date of this order. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banuelos v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Diversified Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Daska P Babcock
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Banuelos
Represented By: Arthur Javier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?