Avalos v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Ceclia Avalos
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 5:2013cv05389
Filed: November 20, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Continuing 9/9/2014 Show Cause Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/4/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. The Court having been notified that this case has been settled, all pending motions, hearings, and deadlines are terminated. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/9/2014 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 9/2/2014. If, however, a dismissal is filed before the hearing date, the Show Cause hearing will be automatically vacated and no statement will be required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/6/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 Referring Case to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/19/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avalos v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Gail C. Trabish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceclia Avalos
Represented By: Sark Ohanian
Represented By: Steven Lance Mazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?