Horus Vision, LLC v. APPLIED BALLISTICS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Horus Vision, LLC
Defendant: APPLIED BALLISTICS, LLC and APPLIED BALLISTICS, INC.
Case Number: 5:2013cv05460
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/31/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING 78 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document on or before 4/6/2015. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/27/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 68 defendants' motion for leave to amend invalidity contentions. 12/9/2014 hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Howard R Lloyd granting 32 Motion to Amend/Correct ; finding as moot 41 Motion to Appear by Telephone (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2014 01:30 PM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/14/2014 02:00 PM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/20/2014 09:00 AM. All Hearings set before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Courtroom #3, 5th Floor, 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 05/29/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horus Vision, LLC v. APPLIED BALLISTICS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horus Vision, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jedediah Knauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLIED BALLISTICS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLIED BALLISTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?