J & J Sport Productions, Inc., v. Salas et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sport Productions, Inc.,
Defendant: Javier Salas and Apolin Castro
Case Number: 5:2013cv05553
Filed: December 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 52 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/27/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2015)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 33 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT. Defendants shall file the third-party complaint by 10/20/2014 and serve Continental within two weeks. Defendants shall also endeavor to meet and confer with Continental as soon as possible to seek its stipulation to adhere to the schedule set by the Court. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 10/16/2014. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Parties are ordered to file certifications and meet and confer in compliance with ADR Local Rules. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 7/21/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Appointing Pro Bono Counsel for Defendants (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sport Productions, Inc., v. Salas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sport Productions, Inc.,
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apolin Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?