Strugala v. Flagstar Bank, FSB
Plaintiff: Lisa Strugala
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Case Number: 5:2013cv05927
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 102 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Parties Shall Appear for a Case Management Conference on September 5, 2019. The Parties Shall File an Updated Case Management Statement on or Before August 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/24/2019. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/27/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 85 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/1/2017. The 9/7/2017 hearing is VACATED. No appearance necessary. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Dismiss. This action is otherwise STAYED. The clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this file. Strugala shall submit a brief Status Report which describes the status of proceedings before th e IRS on 3/6/2016 and continuing every six months thereafter. Furthermore, within 10 days of obtaining an official opinion from the IRS, Strugala shall file a Notice informing the court of such development and request that this matter be reopened and that a Case Management Conference be scheduled. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/19/2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/4/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court finds that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for 9/3/2015, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 11/19/2015. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 11/12/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/31/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court finds that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for July 2, 2015, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on September 3, 2015. The part ies shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before August 27, 2015. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2015 10:00AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/29/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Defendant shall file the anticipated Motion to Dismiss discussed in the statement on or before March 31, 2015, and shall notice the motion for hearing at 9:00 a.m. on May 21, 2015. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for March 12, 2015, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on July 2, 2015. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before June 25, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/9/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 THIRD ORDER RE SETTLEMENT STATUS RE 49 Status Report filed by Flagstar Bank, FSB. On or before February 16, 2015, the parties shall file an updated joint statement which indicates whether or not they have reached an agreement in principle to settle. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for March 12, 2015, shall remain as presently set and will not be continued further, even if settlement negotiations are continuing. Accordingly, unless a Notice of Settlement is filed, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement on or before March 5, 2015, which contains, inter alia, a proposed schedule for this action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/3/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SECOND ORDER RE SETTLEMENT STATUS re 47 Status Report filed by Flagstar Bank, FSB. Having reviewed the parties' Status Report filed on January 9, 2015, and in light of their request for additional time to report whether or not they h ave reached an agreement in principle, the parties shall file a joint statement on or before January 30, 2015, which updates the court on the progress of their settlement discussions and indicates whether, and when, this action may be finally settled. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/12/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT STATUS. In light of the fact that the parties are now in direct discussions, the parties shall file a joint statement on or before January 9, 2015, which updates the court on the progress of their settlement discussions and indicates whether, and when, this action may be finally settled. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/22/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/22/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. On or before 12/19/2014, the parties shall schedule the session and shall file, by that same date, a Notice which provides to the court the date of the next session and the identity of the mediator. Joint Case M anagement Statement due by 3/5/2015. Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Absent a completed agreement to settle this action, the stay entered on September 23, 2014, will be dissolved on that date and the court will re-impose case management deadlines. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/1/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' joint statement filed on October 24, 2014, the court finds that a Status Conference is unnecessary at this time. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/27/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/11/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the pending Motion to Dismiss, the court finds that a conference is premature at this time and hereby VACATES the 4/25/2014 conference. The Court shall set a Case Management Conference, if necessary, in its order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/21/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/21/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strugala v. Flagstar Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Strugala
Represented By: David James Vendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?