BMO Harris Bank, National Association v. Bonan et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank, National Association
Defendant: Charles S. Bonan and Carol Q. Bonan
Case Number: 5:2013cv05929
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 3, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART BMO'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 19 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE AND ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 29 Notice (Other) filed by BMO Harris Bank, National Association. Settlement Conference set for 9/26/2014 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/26/14. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 9/12/2014 11:00 AM. Signed by Donna M. Ryu on 6/24/14. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank, National Association v. Bonan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles S. Bonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Q. Bonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank, National Association
Represented By: Richard Robert Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?