McClafferty v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John McClafferty
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2014cv00186
Filed: January 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1002
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE CASE SCHEDULE AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 9, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 8, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 8, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 10, 2014. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 4, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClafferty v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McClafferty
Represented By: Ruth Silver Taube
Represented By: Melvyn David Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?