Rego v. Sherman
Petitioner: Tarvey Rego
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Case Number: 5:2014cv00187
Filed: January 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/24/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Traverse.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time for Respondents to File its response to the petition. No further extensions will be granted.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 1/17/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rego v. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tarvey Rego
Represented By: Richard Such
Represented By: William Richard Such
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?