Klay v. Santa Cruz County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Kristopher Klay
Defendant: Santa Cruz County Sheriff's Office, Watsonville Police Department, Stefan Fish and Watsonville, City of
Case Number: 5:2014cv00326
Filed: January 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 65 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE (granting 98 , 99 as modified). Jury Selection set for 6/27/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 6/27/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 93 , 94 STIPULATED REQUESTS TO CHANGE CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/9/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON 57 MOTION TO DISMISS FROM APRIL 2, 2015 TO MAY 7, 2015. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/30/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARINGS AND SUBMITTING 32 , 42 PENDING MOTIONS WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT; GRANTING 42 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT; AND DENYING AS MOOT 32 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/9/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 33 DEFENDANT CITY OF SOUTH LAKE TAHOE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING A NEW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (approving 24 , mooting 22 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/18/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klay v. Santa Cruz County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Klay
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Musell
Represented By: Elisa J Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Cruz County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Jason Michael Heath
Represented By: Dana Maureen McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watsonville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefan Fish
Represented By: Jason Michael Heath
Represented By: Dana Maureen McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watsonville, City of
Represented By: Reed William Gallogly
Represented By: Thomas Neal Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?