Hewlett Packard Company v. ServiceNow, Inc.

Plaintiff: Hewlett Packard Company
Defendant: ServiceNow, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv00570
Filed: February 6, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman GRANTING 70 Motion for Summary Judgment.(blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
April 9, 2015 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 92 MOTION FOR STAY; AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/9/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
May 1, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 35 ). The Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2014 is CONTINUED to 6/26/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/1/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
June 11, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE (declining to approve 41 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/11/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
September 5, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/5/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
November 26, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 66 DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ADDITIONAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/26/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
January 6, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 77 STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/6/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 30, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing additional filings re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S. Section 101.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/30/2015.(blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
February 6, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 86 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/6/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewlett Packard Company v. ServiceNow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hewlett Packard Company
Represented By: Mark D. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ServiceNow, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.