Imber-Gluck v. Google Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Ilana Imber-Gluck
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv01070
Filed: March 7, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2015 Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte: Motion Hearing held on 4/3/2015. re 59 MOTION Deny Class Certification filed by Google Inc. Court Reporter Name: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Attachment Minute Order.(jgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/3/2015)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting 59 Motion to Deny Class Certification (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
March 27, 2015 Filing 64 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.S MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATI re 59 by Google Inc. (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 3/27/2015) Modified on 3/30/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2015 Filing 63 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER BREITHAUPT IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATION re 62 filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-A) ( (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 3/27/2015) Modified on 3/30/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2015 Filing 62 REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-A, # 2 Exhibit-B, # 3 Exhibit-C, # 4 Exhibit-D) (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 3/27/2015) Modified on 3/30/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2015 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATION (re 59 filed by Ilana Imber-Gluck, Kristopher Martinez, Gena Walz. (Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 3/17/2015) Text modified on 3/18/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2015 Filing 60 DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER BREITHAUPT IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATION re 59 filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 2/24/2015) Text modified on 2/25/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 3/10/2015. Replies due by 3/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Weingarten, James) (Filed on 2/24/2015) Text modified on 2/25/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2015 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte: Case Management Conference held on 1/23/2015. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte.Court Reporter Name: Not Reported. Attachment Minute Order.(jgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/23/2015)
January 16, 2015 Filing 57 Joint Status Report by Google Inc. (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 1/16/2015) Modified on 1/20/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2014 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Parties are Ordered to File a Joint Status Report on 1/16/2015.***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.***(jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 16, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE OF FINAL COMPLAINT AND DECISION AND ORDER AND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 12/16/2014) Text modified on 12/17/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2014 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The Court Grants the Stipulation for Continuance 53 . Parties are Ordered to File the Consent Decree by 12/17/2014 or Appear for a Case Management Conference on 12/19/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 53 JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Google Inc.. (Roush, Corey) (Filed on 10/31/2014) Modified on 11/3/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2014 Filing 51 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byGoogle Inc.. (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 5, 2014 Filing 52 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 9/5/2014 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 9/5/2014). Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/5/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Approving 49 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 3, 2014 Filing 49 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Patrick F. Madden filed by Ilana Imber-Gluck. (Madden, Patrick) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER 46 for Continuance of Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/28/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 20, 2014 Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byIlana Imber-Gluck, Kristopher Martinez, Gena Walz. (Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 20, 2014 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Case Management Conference filed by Google Inc.. (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 19, 2014 Filing 45 CLERKS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 44 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 43 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Ilana Imber-Gluck. (Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 41 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-20-14, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 36 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2014. (Related documents(s) 36 ) (las, ) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 24, 2014 Filing 40 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Google Inc.. (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 38 CLERKS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
June 24, 2014 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 24, 2014 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ilana Imber-Gluck for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Carson, Shanon) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 20, 2014 Filing 35 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2014 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 6/20/2014) re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by Google Inc.. (Court Reporter Lee-Ann Shortridge.) (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin J. Sweet. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edwin J. Kilpela, Jr. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John R. Robertson. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Logan Michael Breed. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Corey W. Roush. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James H. Weingarten. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER 26 Extending Time to Select ADR Process. Time is Extended to 7/11/2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/18/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Google, Inc.) (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re ADR Process filed by Google Inc.. (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward Schmidtlein (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 24 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (re 20 filed by Google Inc. (Dixon, Megan) (Filed on 5/27/2014) Modified on 5/28/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2014 Filing 23 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint (re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint ) filed byIlana Imber-Gluck. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 5/19/2014) Modified on 5/20/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2014 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Benjamin J. Sweet ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8596476.) filed by Ilana Imber-Gluck. (Sweet, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Edwin J. Kilpela Jr. ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8595066.) filed by Ilana Imber-Gluck. (Kilpela, Edwin) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 5/19/2014. Replies due by 5/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein in Support of Google, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Google, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Dixon, Megan) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for John R. Robertson ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8585777.) filed by Google Inc.. (Robertson, John) (Filed on 5/2/2014) Modified on 5/2/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Logan Michael Breed ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8582784.) filed by Google Inc.. (Breed, Logan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) Modified on 5/2/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Corey W. Roush ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8582541.) filed by Google Inc.. (Roush, Corey) (Filed on 5/1/2014) Modified on 5/2/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2014 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney James H. Weingarten ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8549360.) filed by Google Inc.. (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified on 4/22/2014 (srm, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2014 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE OF SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shanon J. Carson. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick F. Madden. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Dixon for Defendant Google, Inc. (Dixon, Megan) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Patrick F. Madden ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8503204.) filed by Ilana Imber-Gluck. (Madden, Patrick) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Shanon J. Carson ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8503168.) filed by Ilana Imber-Gluck. (Carson, Shanon) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 9 JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Google Inc.. (Dixon, Megan) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified on 4/2/2014 (srm, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal remains as the referral judge to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 3/24/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: All matters presently set before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal are hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ilana Imber-Gluck.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Patterson, James) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Google Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Patterson, James) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8433433.). Filed byIlana Imber-Gluck. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, # 4 Attachment to Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Patterson, James) (Filed on 3/7/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imber-Gluck v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilana Imber-Gluck
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Patrick Fanning Madden
Represented By: James Richard Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?