Gorski v. Gymboree Corporation, The

Plaintiff: Elektra Printz Gorski
Defendant: Gymboree Corporation, The
Case Number: 5:2014cv01314
Filed: March 21, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 30, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
November 18, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on November 18, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
October 27, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE Of Continuance of Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Settlement Conference is continued to 11/20/2014 at 01:00 PM. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
August 15, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Settlement Conference set for 11/20/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
July 23, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/23/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 16, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorski v. Gymboree Corporation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elektra Printz Gorski
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Faucette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gymboree Corporation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?