Hoko v. Transit America Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sione S. Hoko
Defendant: Transit America Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv01327
Filed: March 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order Re: Consideration of Related Case Status. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 01/20/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/9/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND REFERRING PLAINTIFF TO FLASH. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 8/14/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 10 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal remains as the referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 4/15/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoko v. Transit America Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sione S. Hoko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transit America Services, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Garcia, Jr.
Represented By: Clarice C. Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?