Moore v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Adrienne Moore
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv02269
Filed: May 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 28 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Rule 26(f) Report filed by Apple Inc.. (Walsh, David) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 26 Stipulation selecting Private ADR (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 26 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Apple Inc. filed by Apple Inc.. (Walsh, David) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 23, 2014 Filing 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Walsh, David) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 24 REPLY (re 18 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byApple Inc.. (Walsh, David) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 23 Request for Judicial Notice re 22 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byAdrienne Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Katriel, Roy) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 22 OPPOSITION to ( 18 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint ) filed by Adrienne Moore. (Katriel, Roy) (Filed on 8/21/2014) Modified text on 8/25/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2014 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING IN 14-CV-02285 TO DATE SET FOR MOTION HEARING IN 14-CV-02269 AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES IN BOTH CASES TO THE DATE OF MOTION HEARING Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 21, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 21 Clerks Notice (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 19 Stipulation (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 6, 2014 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO AMEND BRIEFING DEADLINES PERTAINING TO DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Adrienne Moore. (Katriel, Roy) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
July 24, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 8/7/2014. Replies due by 8/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Kohlman, # 2 Proposed Order)(Walsh, David) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 21, 2014 Filing 17 SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Apple Inc.. (Walsh, David) (Filed on 7/21/2014) Modified text on 7/22/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2014 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Walsh, David) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 6, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Walsh, Esq , Kai S. Bartolomeo, and Tiffany Cheung (Walsh, David) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Motion to Relate Case. Case 14-cv-02285 is related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
May 21, 2014 Filing 13 MOTION to Relate Case Notice of Related Case filed by Adam Backhaut. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chase, Theodore) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 19, 2014 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings re Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as the referral judge. Hon. Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case.Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 5/19/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/19/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 19, 2014 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrienne Moore. Apple Inc. served on 5/16/2014, answer due 6/6/2014. (Katriel, Roy) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as the referral judge to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 5/16/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adrienne Moore.. (Katriel, Roy) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Katriel, Roy) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8621066.). Filed byAdrienne Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Class Action Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Class Action Complaint, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Katriel, Roy) (Filed on 5/15/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Moore
Represented By: Roy Arie Katriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Kai Shields Bartolomeo
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: David Michael Walsh, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?