Free Range Content, Inc. v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Free Range Content, Inc.
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv02329
Filed: May 20, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2017 233 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 232 STIPULATION TO VACATE ALL PENDING DATES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/20/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 232 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order to Vacate All Pending Dates filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gutkin In Support of Joint Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order to Vacate All Pending Dates)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 13, 2017 231 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 230 Stipulation Re: Continuing Deadline for Discovery Dispute Joint Report. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 12, 2017 230 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request and Proposed Order to Continue Deadline for Discovery Dispute Joint Report filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Robert F. Lopez in Support of Stipulated Request to Continue Deadline for Discovery Dispute Joint Report)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
July 31, 2017 229 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 227 DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/31/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 24, 2017 Reset Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions re 228 Order on Stipulation, Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 12/21/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 24, 2017 228 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 226 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY AND EXPERT DISCOVERY, AND BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/24/2017. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 21, 2017 227 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Class Certification Order Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Li in Support of Defendant Google Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 226 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Close Fact Discovery and Expert Discovery, and Briefing And Hearing Schedule for Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey Gutkin iso Stipulated Request and Proposed Order to Continue Close Fact Discovery and Expert Discovery, and Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Motions for Summary Judgment)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 13, 2017 225 Featured Case ORDER RE REDACTION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 07/13/2017. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 13, 2017 224 Featured Case Document sealed - ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 07/13/2017. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
June 26, 2017 223 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/15/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 23, 2017 222 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 221 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY AND DEADLINE FOR EXPERT MERIT REPORT(S). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/23/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 23, 2017 221 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Close of Fact Discovery and Deadlines for Expert Merit Report(s) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong In Support)(Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 23, 2017 220 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 219 MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/23/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 23, 2017 219 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 23, 2017 218 REPLY (re 171 MOTION to Certify Class CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 160 , 160 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted) ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 212 filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 22, 2017 217 Declaration of Matthew Simpson in Support of 212 Reply to Opposition/Response, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 204 filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 212 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 22, 2017 216 Declaration of Taylor Chose in Support of 212 Reply to Opposition/Response, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 203 filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 212 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 22, 2017 215 Declaration of Michael Clark in Support of 212 Reply to Opposition/Response, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 202 filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 212 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 22, 2017 214 Declaration of John Pettitt in Support of 212 Reply to Opposition/Response, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 201 filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 212 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 22, 2017 213 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of 212 Reply to Opposition/Response, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 200 filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 212 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 22, 2017 212 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** REPLY (re 171 MOTION to Certify Class CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 160 ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 199 filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/22/2017) Modified on 6/23/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT(S) #212 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER 220 Modified on 6/26/2017 (jy, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/26/2017 (jy, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2017 211 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/15/2017, before Judge Freeman. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, telephone number Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 210 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2017. (Related documents(s) 210 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 19, 2017 210 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/15/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Google Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 15, 2017 209 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 6/15/2017 re 160 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted) filed by Taylor Chose, Matthew Simpson, Free Range Content, Inc., Coconut Island Software, Inc. Oral Argument Heard, the Court takes the matter under submission.Total Time in Court: 1:29. Court Reporter Name: Irene Rodriguez. Plaintiff Attorney: Craig Spiegel, Robert Lopez. Defendant Attorney: Michael Rhodes, Kyle Wong, Jeffrey Gutkin, Audrey Mott-Smith. This is a text-only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/15/2017)
June 12, 2017 208 Featured Case ORDER RE 198 PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/12/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 7, 2017 207 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Ripley Spiegel (Spiegel, Craig) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 6, 2017 206 EXHIBITS re 198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Steve Berman in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 2 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted) to Declaration of Steve Berman in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 3 Exhibit 3 (Redacted) to Declaration of Steve Berman in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 4 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Steve Berman in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 5 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Steve Berman in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 6 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Steve Berman in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 7 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Steve Berman in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 8 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply (Unredacted) to Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 9 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply (Redacted) to Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Related document(s) 198 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 205 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew Li in support of Defendant Google Inc.s Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5, # 2 Proposed Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To File Under Seal Pursuant To Civil Local Rules 7-11 And 79-5)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 2, 2017 204 Declaration of Matthew Simpson in Support of 199 Reply to Opposition/Response, Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 199 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 203 Declaration of Taylor Chose in Support of 199 Reply to Opposition/Response, Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 199 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 202 Declaration of Michael Clark in Support of 199 Reply to Opposition/Response, Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 199 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 201 Declaration of John Pettitt in Support of 199 Reply to Opposition/Response, Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 199 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 200 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of 199 Reply to Opposition/Response, Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2 (filed under seal), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (redacted), # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 4-10 (filed under seal))(Related document(s) 199 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 199 REPLY (re 171 MOTION to Certify Class CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 160 ) in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Unredacted version of Berman Supp. Decl. Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted version of Berman Supp. Decl. Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit Redacted version of Berman Supp. Decl. Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted version of Berman Supp. Decl. Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted version of Berman Supp. Decl. Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted version of Berman Supp. Decl. Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit Unredacted version of Berman Supp. Decl. Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit Unredacted version of Berman Supp. Decl. Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit Unredacted version of Berman Supp. Decl. Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit Unredacted version of Berman Supp. Decl. Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit Unredacted version of Berman Supp. Decl. Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit Redacted version of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification, # 15 Exhibit Unredacted version of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
May 11, 2017 197 Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of 193 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 13 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 14 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 16 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 17 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 18 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 19 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 20 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 21 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 22 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 23 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 24 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 25 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 26 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 27 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 28 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 29 Exhibit 29 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 30 Exhibit 30 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 31 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 32 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 33 Exhibit 33 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Related document(s) 193 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 11, 2017 196 Declaration of Dr. Alexander Tuzhilin in Support of 193 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Dr. Alexander Tuzhilin in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Dr. Alexander Tuzhilin in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Related document(s) 193 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 11, 2017 195 Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of 193 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 13 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 14 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 16 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Related document(s) 193 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 11, 2017 194 Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of 193 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Related document(s) 193 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 11, 2017 193 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 143 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED ) Defendant Google, Inc.'s Opposition [Redacted] to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byGoogle Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 3, 2017 192 Featured Case ORDER RE 185 DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/3/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 3, 2017 191 EXHIBITS re 185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND OTHER DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL - CORRECTION OF DOCKET NOS. 175 [175-1 UNREDACTED VERSION of Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification per Order at Docket No. 190 (as filed, but incorrectly titled on the Docket, at Docket No. 176-15) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 185 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 3, 2017 190 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/3/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 2, 2017 189 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 (re 185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND OTHER DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL - CORRECTION OF DOCKET NOS. 175 [175-1, 175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Other Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 7 ) filed byT aylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert F. Lopez, # 2 [Proposed] Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 5/2/2017) Modified on 5/3/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2017 188 Amended Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of 178 Declaration in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification - AMENDED - REDACTED VERSION - CORRECTION OF DOCKET NO. 178 filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 178 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/2/2017) Modified on 5/3/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2017 187 EXHIBITS : REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED re 185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND OTHER DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL - CORRECTION OF DOCKET NOS. 175 [175-1 REDACTED VERSION OF DECLARATION OF ZACHARY LOEBEL-FRIED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION - AMENDED - CORRECTION OF DOCKET NOS. 176 [176-1] filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration UNREDACTED VERSION of Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Amended - CORRECTION OF DOCKET NO. 176-1) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/2/2017) Modified on 5/3/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2017 186 EXHIBIT 9 TO DECLARATION OF KYLE C. WONG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND OTHER DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL - CORRECTION OF DOCKET NOS. 175 [175-1 REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 9 TO DECLARATION OF KYLE C. WONG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT 9 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification - UNREDACTED VERSION) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/2/2017) Modified on 5/3/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2017 185 DEFENDANT GOOGLE INCS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE GOOGLES OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND OTHER DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Amended </b< Declaration of Andrew Li in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5, # 2 Amended (Proposed) Order Granting Google's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/2/2017) Text modified on 5/4/2017 conforming to posted document caption (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2017 184 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Other Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 7 by Audrey Mott-Smith (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Erik A. Kruger)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 183 EXHIBIT 5 TO DECLARATION OF KYLE C. WONG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/1/2017) Modified on 5/1/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2017 182 Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of 177 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, *** # 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , # 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 13 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 14 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 16 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 17 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 18 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 19 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 20 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 21 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 22 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 23 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 24 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 25 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 26 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 27 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 28 Exhibit 29 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 29 Exhibit 30 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 30 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 31 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 32 Exhibit 33 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 33 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Related document(s) 177 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/29/2017) Modified on 5/1/2017 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2017 181 Declaration of Dr. Alexander Tuzhilin in Support of 177 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Dr. Alexander Tzuhilin in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Dr. Alexander Tzuhilin in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Related document(s) 177 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/29/2017)
April 29, 2017 180 Declaration of Stephen Corbett in Support of 177 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Stephen Corbett in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Related document(s) 177 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/29/2017)
April 29, 2017 179 Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of 177 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 13 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 14 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 16 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Ray Liu in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Related document(s) 177 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/29/2017)
April 29, 2017 178 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of 177 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Related document(s) 177 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/29/2017) Modified on 5/2/2017 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2017 177 redacted OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (re 143 filed by Google Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/28/2017) Modified on 5/1/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2017 176 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** EXHIBITS re 175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Other Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 7 9-5 filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration UNREDACTED VERSION OF Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 14 Declaration REDACTED VERSION OF Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 15 Declaration UNREDACTED VERSION OF Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 16 Declaration REDACTED VERSION OF Declaration of Dr. Alexander Tuzhilin in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 17 Declaration UNREDACTED VERSION OF Declaration of Dr. Alexander Tuzhilin in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 18 Exhibit 2 of Declaration of Dr. Alexander Tuzhilin in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 19 Exhibit 1 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 20 Exhibit 2 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 21 Exhibit 3 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 22 Exhibit 4 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 23 Exhibit 5 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 24 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 6 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 25 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 6 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 26 Exhibit 7 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 27 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 8 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 28 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 8 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 29 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 10 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 30 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 10 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 31 Exhibit 11 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 32 Exhibit 12 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 33 Exhibit 17 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 34 Exhibit 18 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 35 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 20 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 36 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 20 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 37 Exhibit 22 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 38 Exhibit 23 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 39 Exhibit 25 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 40 Exhibit 26 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 41 Exhibit 27 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 42 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 30 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 43 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 30 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 44 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 31 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 45 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 31 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 46 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 32 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 47 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 32 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 48 Exhibit 33 of Declaration of Kyle Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 49 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 50 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Related document(s) 175 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/28/2017) Modified on 5/2/2017 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2017 175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Other Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Li in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Google's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 21, 2017 174 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 173 Stipulation Re: Expert Discovery. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
April 20, 2017 173 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 4/20/2017) Modified on 4/21/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2017 172 EXHIBITS re 140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [141-7] filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 140 ) (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 19, 2017 171 Redacted NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 160 filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 4/28/2017. Replies due by 6/2/2017. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 4/19/2017) Modified on 4/20/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2017 170 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 169 STIUPLATION REGARDING EXHIBIT AND REFERENCE IN MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/19/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 18, 2017 169 STIPULATION and (PROPOSED) ORDER re: Exhibit and Reference in Motion for Class Certification filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 4/18/2017) Modified on 4/19/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2017 168 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 (granting 167 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/27/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 24, 2017 167 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO AMEND THE COURTS ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS FILED WITH PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 re 159 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Filed with Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 filed Google Inc.. Responses due by 3/28/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Trevor Kempner in Support of Defendant Google Inc.s Administrative Motion, # 2 (Proposed) Order Amended)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/24/2017) Modified on 3/27/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2017 166 Declaration of Matthew Simpson in Support of 160 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted) filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 160 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 165 Declaration of Taylor Chose in Support of 160 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted) filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 160 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 164 Declaration of Michael Clark in Support of 160 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted) filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 160 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 163 Declaration of John Pettitt in Support of 160 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted) filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 160 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 162 Declaration of Stephen Kiraly in Support of 160 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted) (redacted) filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 160 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 161 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of 160 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted) filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6 (redacted), # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10 (redacted), # 11 Exhibit 11-13 (sealed), # 12 Exhibit 14, # 13 Exhibit 15-17 (sealed), # 14 Exhibit 18 (redacted), # 15 Exhibit 19 (sealed), # 16 Exhibit 20 (redacted), # 17 Exhibit 21 (redacted), # 18 Exhibit 22 (redacted), # 19 Exhibit 23 (sealed), # 20 Exhibit 24 (redacted), # 21 Exhibit 25 (sealed), # 22 Exhibit 26 (redacted), # 23 Exhibit 27 (sealed), # 24 Exhibit 28 (redacted), # 25 Exhibit 29-31 (sealed), # 26 Exhibit 32 (redacted), # 27 Exhibit 33 (sealed), # 28 Exhibit 34 (redacted), # 29 Exhibit 35-37 (sealed), # 30 Exhibit 38 (redacted), # 31 Exhibit 39-40 (sealed), # 32 Exhibit 41 (redacted), # 33 Exhibit 42 (redacted), # 34 Exhibit 43 (redacted), # 35 Exhibit 44-45 (sealed), # 36 Exhibit 46 (redacted), # 37 Exhibit 47, # 38 Exhibit 48, # 39 Exhibit 49-52 (sealed), # 40 Exhibit 53, # 41 Exhibit 54)(Related document(s) 160 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 160 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (redacted) filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 4/28/2017. Replies due by 6/2/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/24/2017) Modified on 3/27/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2017 159 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 140 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/14/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 158 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 154 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,, (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 157 Declaration of Michael Clark in Support of 143 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 147 filed byCoconut Island Software, Inc.. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 156 Declaration of Taylor Chose in Support of 143 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 148 filed byTaylor Chose. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 155 Declaration of Matthew Simpson in Support of 143 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 149 filed byMatthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 154 EXHIBITS re 140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 153 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google, Inc. Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 Exhibit 6 to Berman Decl [REDACTED] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 2 Exhibit 10 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 3 Exhibit 10 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 4 Exhibit 18 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 5 Exhibit 18 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 6 Exhibit 20 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 7 Exhibit 20 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 8 Exhibit 21 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 9 Exhibit 21 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 10 Exhibit 22 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 11 Exhibit 22 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 12 Exhibit 24 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 13 Exhibit 24 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 14 Exhibit 26 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 15 Exhibit 26 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 16 Exhibit 28 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 17 Exhibit 28 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 18 Exhibit 32 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 19 Exhibit 32 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 20 Exhibit 34 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 21 Exhibit 34 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 22 Exhibit 38 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 23 Exhibit 38 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 24 Exhibit 41 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 25 Exhibit 41 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 26 Exhibit 42 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 27 Exhibit 42 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 28 Exhibit 43 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 29 Exhibit 43 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED], # 30 Exhibit 46 to Berman Decl [REDACTED], # 31 Exhibit 46 to Berman Decl [UNREDACTED])(Related document(s) 140 , 153 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 153 Defendant Google, Inc. Response to ( 140 ) Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Zachary Loebel-Fried ISO Google's Response to Plaintiffs' Admin Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting in Part Plaintiffs Admin Motion to File Under Seal)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/14/2017) Modified on 3/14/2017 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2017 152 Declaration of John Pettitt in Support of 143 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 146 filed byFree Range Content, Inc.. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 10, 2017 151 Proposed Order re 140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 150 Proposed Order re 143 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 149 See Document Number 155 for Correction. Declaration of Matthew Simpson in Support of 143 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED filed byMatthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/10/2017) Modified on 3/15/2017 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2017 148 See Document Number 156 for Correction. Declaration of Taylor Chose in Support of 143 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED filed byTaylor Chose. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/10/2017) Modified on 3/15/2017 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2017 147 See Document Number 157 for Correction. Declaration of Michael Clark in Support of 143 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED filed byCoconut Island Software, Inc.. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/10/2017) Modified on 3/15/2017 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2017 146 Please See Document Number 152 for Correction. Declaration of John Pettitt in Support of 143 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED filed byFree Range Content, Inc.. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/10/2017) Modified on 3/13/2017 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2017 145 Declaration of Stephen Kiraly in Support of 143 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED [REDACTED] filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 143 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 144 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of 143 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibits 3-4 (Filed under seal), # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6 (Filed under seal), # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10-13 (Filed under seal), # 10 Exhibit 14, # 11 Exhibits 15-46 (Filed under seal), # 12 Exhibit 47, # 13 Exhibit 48, # 14 Exhibits 49-52 (Filed under seal), # 15 Exhibit 53, # 16 Exhibit 54)(Related document(s) 143 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 143 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 4/28/2017. Replies due by 6/2/2017. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 142 EXHIBITS re 140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted version of Exhibit 26 to Berman Declaration, # 2 Unredacted version of Exhibit 27 to Berman Declaration, # 3 Unredacted version of Exhibit 28 to Berman Declaration, # 4 Unredacted version of Exhibit 29 to Berman Declaration, # 5 Unredacted version of Exhibit 30 to Berman Declaration, # 6 Unredacted version of Exhibit 31 to Berman Declaration, # 7 Unredacted version of Exhibit 32 to Berman Declaration, # 8 Unredacted version of Exhibit 33 to Berman Declaration, # 9 Unredacted version of Exhibit 34 to Berman Declaration, # 10 Unredacted version of Exhibit 35 to Berman Declaration, # 11 Unredacted version of Exhibit 36 to Berman Declaration, # 12 Unredacted version of Exhibit 37 to Berman Declaration, # 13 Unredacted version of Exhibit 38 to Berman Declaration, # 14 Unredacted version of Exhibit 39 to Berman Declaration, # 15 Unredacted version of Exhibit 40 to Berman Declaration, # 16 Unredacted version of Exhibit 41 to Berman Declaration, # 17 Unredacted version of Exhibit 42 to Berman Declaration, # 18 Unredacted version of Exhibit 43 to Berman Declaration, # 19 Unredacted version of Exhibit 44 to Berman Declaration, # 20 Unredacted version of Exhibit 45 to Berman Declaration, # 21 Unredacted version of Exhibit 46 to Berman Declaration, # 22 Unredacted version of Exhibit 49 to Berman Declaration, # 23 Unredacted version of Exhibit 50 to Berman Declaration, # 24 Unredacted version of Exhibit 51 to Berman Declaration, # 25 Unredacted version of Exhibit 52 to Berman Declaration)(Related document(s) 140 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 141 EXHIBITS re 140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted version of Exhibit 10 to Berman Declaration, # 2 Unredacted version of Exhibit 11 to Berman Declaration, # 3 Unredacted version of Exhibit 12 to Berman Declaration, # 4 Unredacted version of Exhibit 13 to Berman Declaration, # 5 Unredacted version of Exhibit 15 to Berman Declaration, # 6 Unredacted version of Exhibit 16 to Berman Declaration, # 7 Unredacted version of Exhibit 17 to Berman Declaration, # 8 Unredacted version of Exhibit 18 to Berman Declaration, # 9 Unredacted version of Exhibit 19 to Berman Declaration, # 10 Unredacted version of Exhibit 20 to Berman Declaration, # 11 Unredacted version of Exhibit 21 to Berman Declaration, # 12 Unredacted version of Exhibit 22 to Berman Declaration, # 13 Unredacted version of Exhibit 23 to Berman Declaration, # 14 Unredacted version of Exhibit 24 to Berman Declaration, # 15 Unredacted version of Exhibit 25 to Berman Declaration)(Related document(s) 140 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 3 Redacted version of Motion for Class Certification, # 4 Unredacted version of Motion for Class Certification, # 5 Redacted version of Kiraly Declaration, # 6 Unredacted version of Kiraly Declaration, # 7 Unredacted version of Exhibit 3 to Berman Declaration, # 8 Unredacted version of Exhibit 4 to Berman Declaration, # 9 Unredacted version of Exhibit 6 to Berman Declaration)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 3, 2017 139 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART 138 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION EXTENDING PARTIES' PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/3/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
March 2, 2017 138 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Extension of Page Limits UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION EXTENDING PARTIES' PAGE LIMITATIONS filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 3/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Audrey J. Mott-Smith in Support of Unopposed Administrative Motion Extending Parties' Page Limitations, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Administrative Motion Extending Parties' Page Limitations)(Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
December 5, 2016 RESET Class Certification Hearing re 137 Order on Stipulation. Motion for Class Certification due 03/10/2017. Opposition to Motion for Class Certification due 04/28/2017. Reply in Support of Class Certification due 06//02/2017. Class Certification Hearing reset from 04/20/2017 to 6/15/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
December 2, 2016 137 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 136 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/2/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
December 1, 2016 136 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Abigail E. Pringle)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 28, 2016 135 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 134 Stipulated Protective Order, as modified by the court. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 23, 2016 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Google Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
October 11, 2016 133 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re: Dkt. No. 132 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
September 15, 2016 132 Discovery Letter Brief re "Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1" filed by Google Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 9, 2016 131 Order Instructing Parties to File Discovery Dispute Joint Report If Necessary Re 130 . Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/9/2016. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 8, 2016 130 Letter from Jeffrey M. Gutkin to Judge Lloyd re Sept. 7, 2016 Email re Protective Order Dispute. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
September 1, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearing re 129 Order on Stipulation. Motion for Class Certification due 12/22/2016. Opposition to Motion for Class Certification due 02/09/2017. Reply in Support of Class Certification due 03/16/2017. Class Certification Hearing set for 4/20/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
September 1, 2016 129 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 128 AMENDED STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/1/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
September 1, 2016 128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 127 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE (AMENDED) filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
August 31, 2016 127 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
July 13, 2016 126 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 125 STIPULATION RE: ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
July 11, 2016 125 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Free Range Content, Inc. filed by Free Range Content, Inc.. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
June 27, 2016 124 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference that was scheduled on 6/24/2016, was taken off calendar. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 14, 2016 123 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 6/13/2016 with Howard Herman. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 6/24/2016 at 2:30 PM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 13, 2016 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail E Pringle (Pringle, Abigail) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 3, 2016 121 Featured Case ORDER RE 119 JOINT SCHEDULING SUBMISSION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 120 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Google Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Third Amended Class Action Complaint byGoogle Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 27, 2016 119 Statement Joint Scheduling Submission by Google Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 23, 2016 118 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 117 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR GOOGLE TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 19, 2016 117 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadline for Google to Answer Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Jeffrey M. Gutkin)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 13, 2016 116 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 94 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
March 30, 2016 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 3/30/2016 with Howard Herman. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 6/13/2016 at 9:30 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
February 18, 2016 115 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 114 Case Management Conference - Further, Class Certification Hearing set for 01/19/2017 at 9:00 AM. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 11/02/2017 at 9:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2018 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 3/19/2018 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 3/19/2018, 3/20/2018, 3/21/2018, 3/22/2018, 3/23/2018, 3/26/2018, 3/27/2018, 3/28/2018, 3/29/2018 and 3/30/2018 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 02/18/2016. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 114 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/18/2016.FTR Time: 10:05 - 10:12. Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Lopez. Defendant Attorney: Michael Rhodes, Jeffrey Gutkin. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 2/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 113 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 2/18/2016 re 94 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Google Inc. The Court takes the matter under submission.Total Time in Court: 56 minutes. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Lopez. Defendant Attorney: Michael Rhodes, Jeffrey Gutkin. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 2/18/2016)
February 11, 2016 112 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Amended Joint Case Management Statement filed by Google Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
December 22, 2015 111 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 105 DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE INITIAL CLASS MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 21, 2015 110 OBJECTIONS to re 105 MOTION for Leave to File Google Inc.s Administrative Motion for Leave to File Motion for a Denial of Class Treatment for Putative Class Members Residing Outside of the United States, Its Territories, and Canada by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 18, 2015 109 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gutkin in Support of 105 MOTION for Leave to File Google Inc.s Administrative Motion for Leave to File Motion for a Denial of Class Treatment for Putative Class Members Residing Outside of the United States, Its Territories, and Canada filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 105 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 108 EXHIBITS re 105 MOTION for Leave to File Google Inc.s Administrative Motion for Leave to File Motion for a Denial of Class Treatment for Putative Class Members Residing Outside of the United States, Its Territories, and Canada Exhibit 3 - Google Inc.s Request to Deem Certain Documents Incorporated by Reference into the Third Amended Complaint in Support of Its Motion for a Denial of Class Treatment for Putative Class Members Residing Outside of the United States, Its Territories, and Canada filed by Google Inc. (Related document(s) 105 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/18/2015) Modified on 12/21/2015 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2015 107 EXHIBITS re 105 MOTION for Leave to File Google Inc.s Administrative Motion for Leave to File Motion for a Denial of Class Treatment for Putative Class Members Residing Outside of the United States, Its Territories, and Canada Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Google Inc.s Motion for a Denial of Class Treatment for Putative Class Members Residing Outside of the United States, Its Territories, and Canada filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP)(Related document(s) 105 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 106 EXHIBITS re 105 MOTION for Leave to File Google Inc.s Administrative Motion for Leave to File Motion for a Denial of Class Treatment for Putative Class Members Residing Outside of the United States, Its Territories, and Canada Exhibit 1- Google Inc.s Motion for a Denial of Class Treatment for Putative Class Members Residing Outside of the United States, Its Territories, and Canada filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 105 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 105 MOTION for Leave to File Google Inc.s Administrative Motion for Leave to File Motion for a Denial of Class Treatment for Putative Class Members Residing Outside of the United States, Its Territories, and Canada filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 16, 2015 104 REPLY (re 94 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint ) Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 1, 2015 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 12/1/2015 with Howard Herman. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 3/30/2016 at 9:30 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 25, 2015 103 RESPONSE (re 94 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 17, 2015 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is: Reply to Opposition/Response. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 100 Objection filed by Google Inc. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 16, 2015 102 Featured Case ORDER STRIKING 99 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/16/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 16, 2015 101 Brief re 100 Objection Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Response to Google Inc.'s Objection of November 16, 2015 filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 100 ) (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 16, 2015 100 OBJECTIONS to re 99 Opposition/Response to Motion, Defendant Google Inc.s Objection to Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Google Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 10, 2015 99 RESPONSE (re 94 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
October 19, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing re 98 Order on Stipulation, Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2016 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2016. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 98 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 97 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 16, 2015 97 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gutkin in Support of Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 13, 2015 96 Proposed Order re 94 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Google Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 13, 2015 95 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of 94 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 8 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 9 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 10 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 11 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 12 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 13 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 14 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 15 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 16 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 17 Exhibit 29 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 18 Exhibit 30 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 19 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 20 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint)(Related document(s) 94 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 13, 2015 94 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/27/2015. Replies due by 11/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # 12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # 13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 9, 2015 93 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. re 15 Certificate of Interested Entities (Supplemental) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
September 15, 2015 92 AMENDED COMPLAINT (THIRD) against Google Inc.. Filed byFree Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Taylor Chose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
August 25, 2015 91 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 84 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF 66 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended complaint due by 9/15/2015. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/25/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
July 28, 2015 90 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/16/2015, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 89 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2015. (Related documents(s) 89 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 27, 2015 89 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 16, 2015 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 7/16/2015 re 84 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Taylor Chose, Matthew Simpson, Free Range Content, Inc., Coconut Island Software, Inc. The Court takes the matter under submission. Case Management Conference set for 07/16/2015 is continued to 10/29/2015 at 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2015. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher, Time in Court: 9:15 - 9:53. Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Lopez. Defendant Attorney: Michael Rhodes, Jeff Gutkin. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2015) Modified on 7/16/2015 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2015 87 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Amended Joint Case Management Statement filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
June 4, 2015 86 REPLY (re 84 MOTION for Reconsideration ) filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
May 21, 2015 85 RESPONSE (re 84 MOTION for Reconsideration ) DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed byGoogle Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 1, 2015 Set Hearing re 84 MOTION for Reconsideration Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. This is a text only docket entry, no document associated with this entry. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
April 30, 2015 84 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 23, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 23, 2015 83 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING, AS MODIFIED, 82 STIPULATION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs shall notice their motion for reconsideration to be heard on 7/16/2015 at 9:00 a.m. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to 7/16/2015 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 4/23/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 22, 2015 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order to Set Briefing Schedule for Motion for Reconsideration, to Set Date for Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration, and to Continue Case Management Conference (L.R. 6-2(a)) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Kyle C. Wong)(Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 21, 2015 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 4/20/2015 with Howard Herman. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 12/1/2015 at 9:30 AM. Call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
March 27, 2015 81 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 75 . Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 3/27/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 24, 2015 80 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of 79 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Related document(s) 79 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 24, 2015 79 REPLY (re 75 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration ) Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 22, 2015 78 RESPONSE (re 75 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration ) Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed byGoogle Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/22/2015)
March 17, 2015 77 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/12/2015, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2015. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 3/17/2015) Modified on 3/17/2015 (sp, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2015 76 Declaration of Robert F. Lopez in Support of 75 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed byFree Range Content, Inc.. (Related document(s) 75 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 75 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Free Range Content, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 9, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 9, 2015 74 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING, AS MODIFIED, 72 STIPULATION RE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 3/9/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 9, 2015 73 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) [CORRECTED] against Google Inc.. Filed byFree Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Taylor Chose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 6, 2015 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Second Amended Complaint filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 5, 2015 71 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against Google Inc.. Filed byFree Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Taylor Chose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
February 19, 2015 70 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/12/15, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 64 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2015. (Related documents(s) 64 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 12, 2015 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/12/2015. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Further Case Management Conference set for 04/23/2015 at 1:30 pm. Plaintiff Attorney: Steve Berman. Defendant Attorney: Michael Rhodes, Jeffrey Gutkin. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion to Dismiss Hearing held on 2/12/2015. Amended Complaint due by 3/5/2015. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Steve Berman. Defendant Attorney: Michael Rhodes, Jeffrey Gutkin. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 67 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 54 MOTION TO RELATE CASE. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 2/12/2015.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 66 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 38 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended complaint due no later than 3/5/2015. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 2/12/2015.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 65 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 64 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 11, 2015 63 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byTaylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 5, 2015 62 RESPONSE (re 54 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed bySuper Cray Inc.. (Gaw, Randolph) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 5, 2015 61 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 5, 2015 60 Certificate of Interested Entities by Coconut Island Software, Inc. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 5, 2015 59 NOTICE by Coconut Island Software, Inc. of Plaintiff Coconut Island Software, Inc.'s Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 5, 2015 58 Certificate of Interested Entities by Matthew Simpson (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 5, 2015 57 Certificate of Interested Entities by Taylor Chose (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 5, 2015 56 Certificate of Interested Entities by Free Range Content, Inc. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 5, 2015 55 NOTICE by Free Range Content, Inc. of Plaintiff Free Range Content, Inc.'s Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 4, 2015 54 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Relate Cases, # 2 Proposed Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re: Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Relate Cases)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
January 21, 2015 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 1/20/2015 with Howard Herman. Further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 4/20/2015 at 9:30 AM. Call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 14, 2015 53 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 52 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 1/14/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 13, 2015 52 MOTION to Continue Hearing Date on ( 38 ) Motion to Dismiss and to Continue Case Management Conference (Unopposed) filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 1/13/2015) Modified text to add linkage on 1/14/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2015 51 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Coconut Island Software, Inc.) (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 50 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Free Range Content, Inc.) (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 49 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Taylor Chose) (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 48 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Matthew Simpson) (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 47 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
December 19, 2014 46 DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (re 38 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ) filed by Google Inc. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/19/2014) Modified on 12/22/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2014 45 DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (re 38 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ) filed by Google Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/19/2014) Modified on 12/22/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2014 44 MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re 41 by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/21/2014) Text modified on 11/24/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2014 43 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS Date: January (re 38 filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix CACI No. 303)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/21/2014) Text modified on 11/24/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2014 42 CLERK'S NOTICE, Set/Reset MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT set for 01/29/2015 at 9:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2015 01:30 PM. All Hearings set before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 15, 2014 41 Request for Judicial Notice re 38 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 40 Declaration of KYLE C. WONG in Support of 38 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13, # 2 Exhibit 14, # 3 Exhibit 15, # 4 Exhibit 16, # 5 Exhibit 17, # 6 Exhibit 18, # 7 Exhibit 19, # 8 Exhibit 20, # 9 Exhibit 21, # 10 Exhibit 22, # 11 Exhibit 23, # 12 Exhibit 24, # 13 Exhibit 25, # 14 Exhibit 26, # 15 Exhibit 27, # 16 Exhibit 28, # 17 Exhibit 29, # 18 Exhibit 30, # 19 Exhibit 31, # 20 Exhibit 32, # 21 Exhibit 33)(Related document(s) 38 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 39 Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of 38 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) 38 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 38 DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/29/2014. Replies due by 11/5/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/15/2014) Modified on 10/16/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2014 37 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Tuesday, January 20, 2015 at 9:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 13, 2014 36 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) re 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference re document 35 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
October 13, 2014 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
October 9, 2014 34 Order, as modified, granting 33 GOOGLES UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION EXTENDING PARTIES PAGE LIMITATIONS. The parties are admonished that footnotes shall be double-spaced and conform to the font requirements of Civil L.R. 3-4(c). Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 10/9/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 7, 2014 33 Unopposed Administrative MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Extending Parties' Page Limitations filed by Google Inc.(Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong ISO Unopposed Administrative Motion Extending Parties' Page Limitations, # 2 Proposed Order on Google's Unopposed Administrative Motion Extending Parties' Page Limitations)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/7/2014) Modified on 10/8/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2014 32 Order granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Howard. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 9/16/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 16, 2014 31 Order granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Simon Bahne Paris. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 9/16/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 15, 2014 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Patrick Howard ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8920037.) filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Howard, Patrick) (Filed on 9/15/2014) Modified on 9/16/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2014 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Simon Bahne Paris ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8920012.) filed by Taylor Chose, Coconut Island Software, Inc., Free Range Content, Inc., Matthew Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Paris, Simon) (Filed on 9/15/2014) Modified on 9/16/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2014 28 CLERK'S NOTICE, Set/Reset Hearing as to Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, U.S. District Court, 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113. ***THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY*** (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 10, 2014 27 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Google Inc.. Filed by Free Range Content, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/10/2014) Modified on 9/11/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2014 26 Order granting 25 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 9/10/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 9, 2014 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Robert F. Lopez Decl. ISO Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/9/2014) Modified on 9/10/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2014 24 Request for Judicial Notice re 21 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 21 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 20, 2014 23 Declaration of KYLE C. WONG in Support of 21 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF KYLE C. WONG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10, # 6 Exhibit 11, # 7 Exhibit 12, # 8 Exhibit 13, # 9 Exhibit 14, # 10 Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) 21 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 20, 2014 22 Declaration of Jim Gray in Support of 21 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF JIM GRAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 21 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 20, 2014 21 MOTION to Dismiss **DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT** filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 9/3/2014. Replies due by 9/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/20/2014) Modified on 8/21/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2014 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Christopher Wong for defendant Google, Inc. (Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 8/20/2014) Modified on 8/21/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2014 19 Order denying 18 Stipulated Request to Extend Page Limitations. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/11/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 8, 2014 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING PARTIES' PAGE LIMITATIONS filed by Google Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
June 18, 2014 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Free Range Content, Inc. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 17, 2014 16 Order granting 14 Stipulated Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; Stipulated Request to Continue Briefing Schedule. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 6/17/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 13, 2014 15 Google Inc.'s Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Google (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2014) Modified on 6/16/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2014 14 Stipulated Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a)); Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order to Continue Briefing Schedule (L.R. 6-2(a)) filed by Google Inc. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2014) Text modified on 6/16/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2014 13 Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Google Inc by Jeffrey Gutkin (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2014) Modified on 6/16/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2014 12 Summons issued as to Google Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014) Incorrect event type selected when posting document on 5/29/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2014 11 Order granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Robert F. Lopez. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/23/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 23, 2014 10 Order granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Steve W. Berman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/23/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 21, 2014 8 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as the referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 5/21/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 21, 2014 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 21, 2014 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Free Range Content, Inc... (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 21, 2014 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Robert F. Lopez ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8633761.) filed by Free Range Content, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 21, 2014 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Steve W. Berman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8633733.) filed by Free Range Content, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 21, 2014 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 20, 2014 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose at the US District Court, 280 South First Street, San Jose, CA 95113.. Signed by Judge Freeman on 5/20/14. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 2 Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8630586.). Filed byFree Range Content, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 5/20/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Free Range Content, Inc. v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Free Range Content, Inc.
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Gutkin
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?