Fatdoor, Inc. et al v. Nextdoor.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Raj Abhyanker and Fatdoor, Inc.
Defendant: Nextdoor.com, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv02335
Filed: May 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order Approving 66 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 12/5/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order Granting 63 Stipulation Regarding Partial Stay and Withdrawal of Fatdoor, Inc.'s Motion to Stay. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. The hearing on counterclaim defendant Raj Abhyanker's Motion to Dismiss remains scheduled for 12/11/2014 at 09:00 AM.Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 9/30/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Claims Construction Tutorial set for 7/10/2015 09:00 AM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/17/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 08/21/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order Granting 40 Stipulation to Continue CMC and Related Deadlines. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 7/23/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 24 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 7/2/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fatdoor, Inc. et al v. Nextdoor.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nextdoor.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raj Abhyanker
Represented By: Raj Vasant Abhyanker
Represented By: Scott Jeffrey Allen
Represented By: Roy Patrick Montgomery
Represented By: Bruno W. Tarabichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatdoor, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Jeffrey Allen
Represented By: Raj Vasant Abhyanker
Represented By: Roy Patrick Montgomery
Represented By: Bruno W. Tarabichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?