Huynh v. Sanchez et al
Plaintiff: Thanh Huynh
Defendant: Alex Sanchez and Housing Authority of the County of Santa Clara
Case Number: 5:2014cv02367
Filed: May 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 AMENDED Order Granting Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/17/17. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Order Regarding Preliminary Approval Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 09/01/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Order by Judge Lucy Koh Denying 79 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Order Regarding Questions for Summary Judgment Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 05/10/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 41 Motion to Certify Class (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 **E-FILED IN ERROR; the parties should disregard this filing.** (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (sms, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 10/07/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 7/30/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 1/7/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 10/1/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huynh v. Sanchez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thanh Huynh
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Sanchez
Represented By: John Algot List
Represented By: Karen K. McCay
Represented By: Servando R. Sandoval
Represented By: Helene Anastasia Simvoulakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of the County of Santa Clara
Represented By: John Algot List
Represented By: Karen K. McCay
Represented By: Servando R. Sandoval
Represented By: Helene Anastasia Simvoulakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?