Kimberly Erin Caselman v. Pier 1 Imports, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kimberly Erin Caselman
Defendant: Pier 1 Imports, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv02383
Filed: May 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/28/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying as moot 63 Amended Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/3/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/16/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 18 Motion Regarding Suggestion of Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 28, 2014 re 34 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/1/2014. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimberly Erin Caselman v. Pier 1 Imports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Erin Caselman
Represented By: Elizabeth Kristen
Represented By: Giselle Olmedo
Represented By: Sharon Terman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pier 1 Imports, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Burns, Esq.
Represented By: Laura J. Maechtlen
Represented By: Julie Grace Yap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?