Olga Gorbacheva v. Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan et al
Plaintiff: Olga Gorbacheva
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc. and James Sipes
Case Number: 5:2014cv02524
Filed: June 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(ii) filed by Olga Gorbacheva. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for 8/13/2020 is HEREBY CONTINUED to 8/27/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Updated statement due or dismissal due by 8/17/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Statement re #140 Order, / Joint Statement Regarding Status by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Order Granting Unopposed #141 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/4/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION for Release of Bond Obligation / Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Release of Supersedeas Bond and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. Responses due by 6/17/2020. Replies due by 6/24/2020. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting request for 90 day continuance. OSC reset to August 13, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. A dismissal or joint statement re status is due August 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/29/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF #140 Order: Show Cause Response OR Dismissal due by 8/3/2020. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/13/2020 10:00 AM. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Olga Gorbacheva Joint Statement re Order to Show Cause. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Statement re #135 Terminate Hearings,, Order to Show Cause, #137 Order - Defendants' Statement re Order to Show Cause by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER approving request to continue OSC hearing. The OSC hearing is continued to 5/7/2020. A response to the OSC or dismissal is due 4/27/2020. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/13/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Statement re #135 Terminate Hearings,, Order to Show Cause, Joint Statement re Order to Show Cause by Olga Gorbacheva. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF #137 Order: Show Cause Response OR Dismissal due by 4/27/2020. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/7/2020 10:00 AM. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/26/2020 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response OR Dismissal due by 3/16/2020. The Status Conference date of 2/13/2020 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/11/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE by Olga Gorbacheva of Settlement of all Claims (Keenley, James) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Order granting #131 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/4/2020. Counsel must contact CourtCall Phone Conferencing at (866) 582-6878 in advance of the hearing to schedule a telephonic appearance. Please inform CourtCall you have been approved for a telephonic appearance by the Court. The parties are to adhere to CourtCalls procedures. To ensure the quality of the record, the parties should avoid the use of mobile phones, speakerphones, public telephone booths, or phones in other public places. If your matter is vacated after arranging for an appearance through CourtCall, please notify CourtCall that your matter has been taken off calendar and you do not need a telephonic appearance. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Status Conference filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 1/27/2020) Modified on 1/27/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that a Status Conference has been set for 2/13/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Status Report due by 2/3/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MANDATE of USCA as to #107 Notice of Appeal, filed by Olga Gorbacheva (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER of USCA as to #107 Notice of Appeal, filed by Olga Gorbacheva.The panel has voted to deny the petition for rehearing. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc, and no judge of the court has requested a vote on the petition for rehearing en banc. Fed. R. App. P. 35(b). The petition for rehearing and the petition for rehearing en banc are denied. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph James Torres (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 USCA MEMORANDUM - AFFIRMED in part and REVERSED and REMANDED in part. as to #120 Notice of Appeal, filed by Abbott Laboratories Inc., James Sipes, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, #107 Notice of Appeal, filed by Olga Gorbacheva (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #121 Motion for approval of supersedeas bond and to stay enforcement pending appeal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/23/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #121 MOTION to Stay Enforcement, Pending Appeal, of Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs to Plaintiff and for Approval of Supersedeas Bond; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Statement of No Opposition to Motion filed byOlga Gorbacheva. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes (Ninth Circuit Local Rule 10-3.1(c) Transcript Notice) (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 USCA Case Number 18-16178 9th circuit court of appeals for #120 Notice of Appeal, filed by Abbott Laboratories Inc., James Sipes, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION to Stay Enforcement, Pending Appeal, of Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs to Plaintiff and for Approval of Supersedeas Bond; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/9/2018. Replies due by 7/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12463216 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Representation Statement)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying #109 Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part #110 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/25/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motions for Defendants and Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (Docket Item No. #109 and #110 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 5/31/2018 at 9:00 AM have been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 5/31/2018 hearing is VACATED - NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motions. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #112 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/10/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER of USCA as to #107 Notice of Appeal, filed by Olga Gorbacheva (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 REPLY (re #110 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs of Suit ) filed byOlga Gorbacheva. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REPLY (re #109 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Costs Of Action And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof ) (In Support) filed byAbbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #109 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Costs Of Action And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof ) filed byOlga Gorbacheva. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James P. Keenley, #2 Declaration of Olga Gorbacheva)(Keenley, James) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Permitting Defendants to Withdraw the Declaration of Clarissa A. Kang filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #110 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs of Suit ) filed byAbbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Highlighted Time Entries)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs of Suit filed by Olga Gorbacheva. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/26/2018. Replies due by 4/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James P. Keenley, #2 Declaration of Glenn R. Kantor, #3 Declaration of Joseph Creitz, #4 Declaration of Michelle Roberts)(Keenley, James) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Costs Of Action And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/26/2018. Replies due by 4/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 -- Torres Declaration (with Exhibits A-C), #3 Exhibit 2 - Kriz Declaration (with Exhibit A), #4 Exhibit 3 - Baker Declaration (with Exhibit A), #5 Exhibit 4 - Kang Declaration (with Exhibit A), #6 Proposed Order)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 USCA Case Number 18-15400 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for #107 Notice of Appeal, filed by Olga Gorbacheva. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Olga Gorbacheva. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12177371 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement and Service List)(Keenley, James) (Filed on 3/11/2018)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #105 Stipulation to enlarge time to file attorney's fees motions and bill of costs. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/20/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Enlarge Time to file Attorney's Fees Motions and Bill of Costs filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph J. Torres in Support of Stipulation to Enlarge Time to file Attorney's Fees Motions and Bill of Costs)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 2/19/2018)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 JUDGMENT. THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THIS FILE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/12/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018) Modified on 2/12/2018 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #89 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #91 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/12/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Stipulation to vacate trial setting conference date. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/1/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Vacate Trial Setting Conference Date filed by Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph J. Torres in Support of Stipulation to Vacate Trial Setting Conference Date)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Granting #99 Stipulation to Extend Trial Setting Conference Date. Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement due by 2/5/2018. Trial Setting Conference set for 2/15/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/8/2017.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Trial Setting Conference Date filed by Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph J. Torres in Support of Stipulation to Extend Trial Setting Conference Date)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motions for Summary Judgment #89 and Judgment as a Matter of Law #91 before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 11/30/2017 at 9:00 AM have been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 11/30/2017 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motions. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE. Please take NOTICE that the Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 11/16/2017 is hereby RESET to 12/21/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement due by 12/13/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motions Hearing. Please take NOTICE that the motions hearing date of 10/12/2017 is hereby CONTINUED to 11/30/2017 09:00AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila as to #89 Motion for Summary Judgment, and #91 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Administrative Record or, in the Alternative, an Order Setting the Case for Trial De Novo. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPLY (re #91 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Administrative Record or, in the Alternative, an Order Setting the Case for Trial De Novo ) filed byOlga Gorbacheva. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 REPLY (re #89 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byAbbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #89 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byOlga Gorbacheva. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James P. Keenley in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Keenley, James) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #91 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Administrative Record or, in the Alternative, an Order Setting the Case for Trial De Novo ) filed byAbbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Declaration of Pamela Hannon, #2 Exhibit 2 - Second Declaration of Joseph J. Torres, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Heather Lehman Kriz)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Administrative Record or, in the Alternative, an Order Setting the Case for Trial De Novo filed by Olga Gorbacheva. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/12/2017. Replies due by 9/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James P. Keenley in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment)(Keenley, James) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Statement re #89 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts) by Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/12/2017. Replies due by 9/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Pamela Hannon, #3 Exhibit 2: Declaration of Joseph J. Torres, #4 Exhibit 3: Declaration of Ted V. Parker)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan for Supplemental Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 16, #2 Exhibit Part 17, #3 Exhibit Part 18)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan for Supplemental Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 11, #2 Exhibit Part 12, #3 Exhibit Part 13, #4 Exhibit Part 14, #5 Exhibit Part 15)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan for Supplemental Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 6, #2 Exhibit Part 7, #3 Exhibit Part 8, #4 Exhibit Part 9, #5 Exhibit Part 10)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan for Supplemental Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4, #5 Exhibit Part 5)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE DATE, granting #83 . Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/28/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Resetting hearing: 10/26/2017 Trial Setting Conference is reset to 11/16/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Pursuant to ECF No. #84 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Trial Setting Conference Date filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph J. Torres)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. The Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 6/22/2017 is CONTINUED to 10/26/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/20/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement by Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 6/12/2017) Modified on 6/12/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting #79 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Anticipated Dispositive Motions to 9:00 a.m. on 10/12/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/21/2017. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Set/Reset Hearing date pursuant to ECF #80 as to Anticipated Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Hearing Date filed by Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint #74 byAbbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement due by 6/12/2017. Trial Setting Conference set for 6/22/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 10/5/2017 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/7/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/16/2017, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, telephone number Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #75 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2017. (Related documents(s) #75 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/16/2017 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Supplemental Complaint against Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan. Filed by Olga Gorbacheva. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 2/23/2017) Modified text on 2/23/2017, (to confirm with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing as to ECF #62 MOOT as Order ECF #72 Denied the Motion. Further Case Management Conference held on 2/16/2017. The Court will order Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint. The Court will refer this matter to ADR after the responsive pleadings have been filed. The Court will issue a Case Management Order which will set forth a schedule for the case. Plaintiff Attorney Jim Keenley. Defendant Attorney Joseph Torres. Total Time in Court:10:04-10:18am(14 Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. This is a text only Minute Entry (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2017)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #62 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/15/2017. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION #68 TO REMOVE ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE AND SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONTINUING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS. It is hereby ordered that THE CLERK SHALL REOPEN THIS CASE. The hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs #62 currently set for 1/26/2017 is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 2/16/2017. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/23/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Response re #68 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Remove Administrative Closure and Set Case Management Conference byAbbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Remove Administrative Closure and Set Case Management Conference filed by Olga Gorbacheva. Responses due by 1/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James P. Keenley in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief, #2 Proposed Order)(Keenley, James) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY (re #62 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs of Suit ) filed byOlga Gorbacheva. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of James P. Keenley)(Keenley, James) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Robb Christopher Adkins for Defendants (Adkins, Robb) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE (re #62 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs of Suit ) filed byAbbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Torres Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 Highlighted Time Entries)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs of Suit filed by Olga Gorbacheva. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/2/2016. Replies due by 9/9/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James P. Keenley, #2 Declaration of Brian H. Kim, #3 Declaration of Daniel Feinberg, #4 Declaration of Teresa S. Renaker, #5 Declaration of Glenn R. Kantor, #6 Declaration Terrence J. Coleman)(Keenley, James) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REMANDING FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS granting in part and denying in part #46 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #49 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on June 30, 2016. (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016) Modified on 6/30/2016 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION(S) UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motions for Summary Judgment (Docket Item Nos. #46 , #49 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 8/20/2015 at 9:00 AM have been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The motion hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion(s). This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY (re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byOlga Gorbacheva. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY (re #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byAbbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Third Declaration of Ted V. Parker, #2 Exhibit 2 - Second Declaration of Joseph J. Torres)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Reply in Support of Their Separate #50 Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment) by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 7/17/2015) Modified on 6/30/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE to re #47 Statement , Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE (re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byAbbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Second Declaration of James Sipes, #2 Exhibit B Second Declaration of Ted V. Parker)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE to re #50 Statement, Response to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts by Olga Gorbacheva. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE (re #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byOlga Gorbacheva. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of James P. Keenley with Exhbitis 43-50)(Keenley, James) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order Granting #51 Stipulation to Extend Briefing re #46 Motion for Summary Judgment, #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/16/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015) Modified text on 6/16/2015 to correct linkage (ecg, COURT STAFF)(x2).
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Opposition due by 6/29/2015. Reply due by 7/17/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ThereofOpposition due due by 6/29/2015. Reply due by 7/17/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Dates filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Statement re #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts) by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/22/2015. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 Parker Decl. Part 1 of 6, #3 Exhibit 1 Parker Decl. Part 2 of 6, #4 Exhibit 1 Parker Decl. Part 3 of 6, #5 Exhibit 1 Parker Decl. Part 4 of 6, #6 Exhibit 1 Parker Decl. Part 5 of 6, #7 Exhibit 1 Parker Decl. Part 6 of 6, #8 Exhibit 2 Torres Decl., #9 Exhibit 3 Sipes Decl.)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4, #5 Exhibit Part 5, #6 Exhibit Part 6, #7 Exhibit Part 7, #8 Exhibit Part 8, #9 Exhibit Part 9, #10 Exhibit Part 10, #11 Exhibit Part 11, #12 Exhibit Part 12, #13 Exhibit Part 13, #14 Exhibit Part 14, #15 Exhibit Part 15)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 5/26/2015) Modified on 5/27/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Statement re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts by Olga Gorbacheva. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Olga Gorbacheva. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/22/2015. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James P. Keneley, #2 Exhibit 1-10, #3 Exhibit 11-25, #4 Exhibit 26-42)(Keenley, James) (Filed on 5/25/2015)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order as Modified by the Court Granting #44 Stipulation to Extend Dates in Case Management Conference Order. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/27/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Dates in Case Management Order filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing ENE Hearing set for 2/13/2015 10:00 AM., at Trucker Huss, APCOne Embarcadero Center, 12th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111-3628 (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order Granting #42 Stipulation Extending ENE Deadline. ENE deadline set for 2/17/2015. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 1/9/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND ENE DEADLINE filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing R. Bradford Huss as ENE Evaluator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Based on the parties' Joint Case Management Statement and proposed schedule, the court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule: The deadline for joinder of any additional parties, or other amendments to the pleadings, is sixty days after entry of this order. This action shall be resolved on cross-motions for summary judgment according to the following schedule: Fact and Expert Discovery cutoff 3/26/2015. Deadline to file Cross Motions due by 4/24/2015. Responses due by 5/22/2015. Replies due by 6/5/2015. Cross Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 6/25/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/4/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order Granting #36 Stipulation selecting Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 10/20/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Keenley, James) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Olga Gorbacheva filed by Olga Gorbacheva. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Heather S. Lehman for Defendants. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 8/6/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order Granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph J. Torres for Defendants. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 8/6/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8823028.) filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lehman, Heather) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as the referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 8/5/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8820609.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/4/2014 filed by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Torres, Joseph) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Claire Schuman (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes.. (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes identifying Other Affiliate Abbott Laboratories for Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan. re #23 Answer to Complaint, (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes re #23 Answer to Complaint, (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 8/4/2014) Modified text on 8/5/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint byAbbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan, Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan, James Sipes. (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Olga Gorbacheva. Service waived by James Sipes waiver sent on 6/5/2014, answer due 8/4/2014. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Olga Gorbacheva. Service waived by Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan waiver sent on 6/5/2014, answer due 8/4/2014. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Olga Gorbacheva. Service waived by Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan waiver sent on 6/5/2014, answer due 8/4/2014. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Olga Gorbacheva. Service waived by Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan waiver sent on 6/5/2014, answer due 8/4/2014. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Olga Gorbacheva. Service waived by Abbott Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2014, answer due 8/4/2014. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Olga Gorbacheva re #13 Summons Issued, #12 Summons Issued, 7 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #15 Summons Issued, #2 Exhibits, #14 Summons Issued, #3 Exhibits, #1 Complaint, #11 Summons Issued, #10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Keenley, James) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Olga Gorbacheva.. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to James Sipes. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, filed by Olga Gorbacheva. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Keenley, James) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/4/2014 document should not have been submitted as a separate docket entry from the initiating document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET [1-2] filed byOlga Gorbacheva. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Keenley, James) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8661248.). Filed byOlga Gorbacheva. (Attachments: *** #1 Exhibit A FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #2 . *** , #2 Exhibit B)(Keenley, James) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olga Gorbacheva v. Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Gorbacheva
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Represented By: Brian Henry Kim
Represented By: Emily A. Bolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Extended Disability Plan
Represented By: Emily Claire Schuman
Represented By: Heather Lehman Kriz
Represented By: Joseph James Torres
Represented By: Robb Christopher Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Annuity Retirement Plan
Represented By: Emily Claire Schuman
Represented By: Heather Lehman Kriz
Represented By: Joseph James Torres
Represented By: Robb Christopher Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Retiree Health Care Plan
Represented By: Emily Claire Schuman
Represented By: Heather Lehman Kriz
Represented By: Joseph James Torres
Represented By: Robb Christopher Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Emily Claire Schuman
Represented By: Heather Lehman Kriz
Represented By: Joseph James Torres
Represented By: Robb Christopher Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sipes
Represented By: Emily Claire Schuman
Represented By: Heather Lehman Kriz
Represented By: Joseph James Torres
Represented By: Robb Christopher Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?