24/7 Customer, Inc. v. 24-7 Intouch et al

Plaintiff: 24/7 Customer, Inc.
Defendant: 24-7 Intouch and Ascenda USA, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv02561
Filed: June 3, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2016 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 110 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc., ***Deadlines terminated. 110 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila o n 1/12/2016. *** Motions terminated: 47 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims for Trademark Dilution filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc., 54 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims for Trademark Dilution filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc., 90 Discovery Letter Brief Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2 filed by 24-7 Intouch, Ascenda USA, Inc., 96 MOTION Reset Case Schedule filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
December 22, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESET CASE SCHEDULE re 96 MOTION Reset Case Schedule filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 96 MOTION Reset Case Schedule : Responses due by 1/14/2016. Replies due by 1/21 /2016. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Motions terminated: 104 STIPULATION WI TH PROPOSED ORDER re 96 MOTION Reset Case Schedule (Modify Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion to Reset Case Schedule) filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc., 97 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/22/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 7, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on 70 Discovery Dispute Joint Report 1 by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
March 31, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 03/31/2015. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015) Modified on 4/2/2015 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT) re 41 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/17/2015.(hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 24/7 Customer, Inc. v. 24-7 Intouch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 24/7 Customer, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Eberhart
Represented By: Mark E. Miller
Represented By: George A. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24-7 Intouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascenda USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?