Campbell v. Obama et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Campbell
Defendant: Notisha Zayndenberg, Lidia Breslavez, Linda Wiley, Michele Schroeder, Venesha Clachar, Robert Brizuela, California State Bar/ Director, Patricia Melenudo, Barack Obama, Paul S. Grewal, Francisco Aguilar, Sylvia M. Burwell, Karen B. Goldberg, J. Alvarez, MP Shoreline Associates, Maria Ivanchuk, Mark Brian, Martha Ray, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. and MP Shoreline Associates a California Limited Partnership doing business as Shorebreeze Apartment
Case Number: 5:2014cv03071
Filed: July 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:2651
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2017 Filing 213 Document Exhibits in Support of Petition for Relief re #211 filed byKenneth L. Campbell (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER DENYING #211 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR RELIEF FILED MARCH 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/20/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2017 Filing 211 NOTICE of Change of Address including Petition for Relief Under Rule 70, FRCP by Kenneth L. Campbell. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
March 18, 2016 Filing 210 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/18/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING REMAINING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS (ECF #129 , #130 , #131 , #155 ) WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; CONSTRUING MOTION TO DISMISS BROUGHT BY PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED DEFENDANT MP SHORELINE (ECF #145 ) AS AN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; TERMINATING AS MOOT MOTION TO DISMISS BROUGHT BY PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED DEFENDANTS LOS ALTOS, ALVAREZ, AND BRIAN (ECF #133 ); DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (ECF #126 ); DENYING PLAINTIFF'S OTHER MOTIONS AND REQUESTS (ECF #140 , #165 , #176 , #180 , #193 , #194 ); AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/18/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (ECF #201 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/18/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL OR GUARDIAN AD LITEM (ECF #147 ); DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A MEDICAL EXAMINATION (ECF #153 ); AND LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/18/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2016 Filing 206 Letter from Kenneth L. Campbell to Transworld Systems, Inc. dated 2/29/16. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
February 17, 2016 Filing 205 Letter from Kenneth L. Campbell to Judge Freeman dated 2/12/16. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 17, 2016 Filing 204 Letter from Kenneth L. Campbell dated 2/12/16. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
January 28, 2016 Filing 203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motions Hearing held on 1/28/2016 re #153 Motion for Medical Examination filed by Kenneth L. Campbell (DENIED), #129 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by California State Bar/Director (SUBMITTED), #155 First Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., (SUBMITTED), #130 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Michele Schroeder,(SUBMITTED), #145 Amended Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by MP Shoreline Associates (SUBMITTED), #147 Motion to Appoint Counsel or Guardian Ad Litem filed by Kenneth L. Campbell (PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT A LETTER FROM DOCTOR RE MEDICAL CONDITION/INCOMPETENCY BY 2/16/2016) (SUBMITTED), #133 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Mark Brian (SUBMITTED), #176 Rebuttal to Los Altos Sub Acute and Application for Imposition Sanctions (Motion for Sanctions)(SUBMITTED), #131 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Barack Obama (SUBMITTED), Motion for Reconsideration re #198 ORDER DENYING #180 Plaintiff's Motion For Disqualification and RECUSAL OF THE UNDERSIGNED JUDGE (SUBMITTED, #140 Notice of Advisement (Set 1) filed by Kenneth L. Campbell (MOOT), #165 Notice of Advisement and Discovery Request filed by Kenneth L. Campbell (MOOT TOO EARLY FOR DISCOVERY), #180 Amended Notice of Motions - Request to add parties filed by Kenneth L. Campbell (DENIED), #193 #194 Discovery requests filed by Kenneth L. Campbell (DENIED). The Court ordered that Plaintiff need only file his ORIGINAL documents with the Court with a courtesy copy for chambers, and THE CLERK WILL SCAN ALL ORIGINALS TO ECF, therefore constituting service to all parties on the E-Service list. Plaintiff DOES NOT HAVE TO FILE A PROOF OF SERVICE. Counsel AGREED that service of documents will be via ECF. THE CLERK IS TO MAIL JUDGE BETH LABSON FREEMAN's STANDING ORDERS TO PLAINTIFF. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THIS CASE IS STAYED until a ruling has been issued by the Court re #147 Request for Guardian Ad Litem - NO FURTHER FILINGS BY PLAINTIFF OR DEFENDANTS OTHER THAN THE LETTER FROM DOCTOR DUE 2/16/16 TO BE FILED BY PLAINTIFF. Court to prepare the Order. Plaintiff: Kenneth Campbell (Pro Se). Defendants Attorneys: Clair Cormier, Mark Torres, Stephen J. Brooks, Steven Mehlman, Mark Edson appeared via CourtCall, Brandon Fields appeared via CourtCall. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) Time in Court:9:01-9:05am, 9:30-10:31am (1.5 hours)This is a text only Minute Entry (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2016) (amkS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2016 Standing Orders for Hon. Judge Beth Labson Freeman mailed to Plaintiff, Kenneth L. Campbell, 460 N. Shoreline Bl. #117, Mountain View, CA 94043 via US First Class Mail. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 27, 2016 Filing 202 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #201 Rebuttal. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 27, 2016 Filing 201 Rebuttal to Court Ruling to re #198 Order, Set Hearings, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, by Kenneth L. Campbell. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER GRANTING #199 DEFENDANTS SENIOR ADULTS LEGAL ASSISTANCE AND MICHELE SCHROEDER'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO RULE 7-11. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/25/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (srnS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2016 Filing 199 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Michele Schroeder. (Edson, Mark) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER DENYING #180 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION AND RECUSAL OF THE UNDERSIGNED JUDGE; AND SETTING #147 , #153 , #165 , #176 , #193 , #194 PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR HEARING ON JANUARY 28, 2016. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/21/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016) Modified on 1/21/2016 (blflc1S, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (srnS, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER GRANTING #196 KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/21/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (srnS, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2016 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is: Motion to Appear by Telephone. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #196 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #155 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution CORRECTION OF DOCKET #151 filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (srn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 196 Motion for Administrative Relief re #155 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution CORRECTION OF DOCKET #151 filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Fields Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fields, Brandon) (Filed on 1/21/2016) Modified event type on 1/21/2016 (srn, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2016 Filing 195 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #193 Discovery Request, #194 Discovery Request (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
January 4, 2016 Filing 194 Discovery Request by Kenneth L. Campbell (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
January 4, 2016 Filing 193 Discovery Request by Kenneth L. Campbell (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 29, 2015 Filing 192 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MP Shoreline Associates re #191 Joinder in Objections to Reply Evidence in Plaintiff's "Rebuttal to Los Altos Sub Acute Response" (Mehlman, Steven) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
December 29, 2015 Filing 191 Joinder re #190 Objection, #187 Response ( Non Motion ) to Reply Evidence in Plaintiff's "Rebuttal to Los Altos Sub Acute Response" by MP Shoreline Associates. (Mehlman, Steven) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
December 28, 2015 Filing 190 OBJECTIONS to re #187 Response ( Non Motion ) Objections To Reply Evidence In Pltff "Rebuttal to Los Altos Sub Acute Response" by J. Alvarez, Mark Brian. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 189 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #188 , #187 . (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 188 Rebuttal to Kaiser Reply re #178 Reply to Opposition/Response, by Kenneth L. Campbell. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 187 Rebuttal to Los Altos Sub Acute Response re #157 Opposition/Response to Motion by Kenneth L. Campbell. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 186 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J. Alvarez, Mark Brian SUPPLEMENTAL CERT OF SERVICE (Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 185 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J. Alvarez, Mark Brian re #182 Reply to Opposition/Response (Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 184 Declaration of KATHLEEN A SOVYAK in Support of #182 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byJ. Alvarez, Mark Brian. (Related document(s) #182 ) (Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 183 DECLARATION of Stephen J Brooks in Opposition to #182 Reply to Opposition/Response IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO PLTF REBUTTAL AND OPP TO APP FOR SANCTIONS filed byJ. Alvarez, Mark Brian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #182 ) (Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 182 REPLY (re #133 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) RESPONSE TO PLTFF REBUTTAL TO LOS ALSO SUB ACUTE AND OPPOSITION TO APP FOR SANCTIONS filed byJ. Alvarez, Mark Brian. (Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #180 Amended Notice of Motions. (srn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 180 Amended Notice of Motions: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Kenneth L. Campbell. (srn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 179 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. re #178 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Fields, Brandon) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 178 REPLY (re #155 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution CORRECTION OF DOCKET #151 ) filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Fields, Brandon) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 23, 2015 Filing 177 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #176 Rebuttal to Los Altos Sub Acute and Application for Imposition Sanctions (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 23, 2015 Filing 176 Rebuttal to Los Altos Sub Acute and Application for Imposition Sanctions. Responses due by 12/7/2015. Replies due by 12/14/2015. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 175 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. re #174 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Fields, Brandon) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER GRANTING #173 DEFENDANT KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.'S MOTION TO CHANGE TIME. Replies due by 11/24/2015. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/18/2015. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2015: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2015 Filing 173 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Fields, Brandon) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 172 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #171 Rebuttal(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 171 Rebuttal to MP Shoreline and Waiver of Objection by Kenneth L. Campbell. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 12, 2015 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is: Certificate/Proof of Service. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #169 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by J. Alvarez, Mark Brian (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 170 REPLY (re #133 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) to Plaintiff's "Notice of Objection and Opposition to Los Altos Sub Acute Proposed Order" And in Support of Defendants' Motion, to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, to Strike Second Amended Complaint F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(6), 12(f) filed byJ. Alvarez, Mark Brian. (Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 169 Certificate of Service (re #133 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) Certificate of Service filed by J. Alvarez, Mark Brian. (Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 11/10/2015) Modified text to correct event selection on 11/12/2015 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2015 Filing 168 REPLY (re #133 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) Declaration of Stephen J. Brooks in Reply to Plaintiff's "Notice of Objection and Opposition to Los Altos Sub Acute Proposed Order" And in Support of Defendants' Motion, to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, to Strike Second Amended Complaint F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(6), 12(f) filed byJ. Alvarez, Mark Brian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 167 Docketed in Error; Please see document number 168 for correction. REPLY (re #133 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) to Plaintiff's "Notice of Objection and Opposition to Los Altos Sub Acute Proposed Order" And in Support of Defendants' Motion, to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, to Strike Second Amended Complaint F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(6), 12(f) filed byJ. Alvarez, Mark Brian. (Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 11/10/2015) Modified on 11/13/2015 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 166 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #164 Notice, #165 Notice (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 165 NOTICE of Advisement and Discovery Request by Kenneth L. Campbell (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 164 NOTICE of Correction and Stipulation by Kenneth L. Campbell (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 163 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MP Shoreline Associates re #162 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Mehlman, Steven) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 162 REPLY (re #145 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) to Plaintiff Kenneth Campbell's Notice of Objection and Opposition to MP Shoreline Associates Motion to Dismiss Including Discovery filed byMP Shoreline Associates. (Mehlman, Steven) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 161 REPLY (re #131 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) filed byBarack Obama. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 160 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #159 Opposition/Response to Motion (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 159 NOTICE OF OBJECTION and OPPOSITION to (re #145 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byKenneth L. Campbell. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 158 Notice of Objection and Opposition to the Federal Defendants Proposed Order to re #132 Proposed Order by Kenneth L. Campbell. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 157 Notice of Objection and Opposition to Los Altos Sub Acute Proposed Order (re #133 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byKenneth L. Campbell. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 156 Notice of Objection and Opposition to Kaiser Motion for Dismissal and to Strike Irrelevant and Immaterial Evidence (re #155 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution CORRECTION OF DOCKET #151 ) filed byKenneth L. Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 155 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution CORRECTION OF DOCKET #151 filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/10/2015. Replies due by 11/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fields, Brandon) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #153 MOTION for Medical Examination, #152 Rebuttal (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015) Modified on 10/26/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2015 Filing 153 MOTION for Medical Examination filed by Kenneth L. Campbell. Responses due by 11/9/2015. Replies due by 11/16/2015. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 152 Rebuttal. re #139 Notice of Objection and Opposition to State Bar Dismissal Motion ( #140 ) Notice of Advisement (Set 1) by Kenneth L. Campbell. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 151 PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NUMBER 155 FOR CORRECTION. First AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/10/2015. Replies due by 11/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Brandon K. Fields, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fields, Brandon) (Filed on 10/23/2015) Modified on 10/26/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/4/2015 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2015 Filing 150 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING as to #131 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing reset for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 20, 2015 Filing 149 REPLY (re #129 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byCalifornia State Bar/ Director. (Torres-Gil, Mark) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #147 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 147 MOTION to Appoint Counsel or Guardian Ad Litem filed by Kenneth L. Campbell. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MP Shoreline Associates re #143 Proposed Order, #141 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #145 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #142 Declaration in Support, #144 Errata Request to Correct Electronic Filing Error (Mehlman, Steven) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 145 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by MP Shoreline Associates. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/30/2015. Replies due by 11/6/2015. (Mehlman, Steven) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 144 ERRATA Request to Correct Electronic Filing Error by MP Shoreline Associates. (Mehlman, Steven) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 143 Proposed Order re #141 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by MP Shoreline Associates. (Mehlman, Steven) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 142 Declaration of Steven J. Mehlman in Support of #141 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byMP Shoreline Associates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #141 ) (Mehlman, Steven) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 141 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by MP Shoreline Associates. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/30/2015. Replies due by 11/6/2015. (Mehlman, Steven) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 140 NOTICE of Advisement (Set 1) by Kenneth L. Campbell. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 139 Notice of Objection and Opposition to State Bar Dismissal Motion (re #129 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byKenneth L. Campbell. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 15, 2015 Filing 138 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Responses due by 10/29/2015. Replies due by 11/5/2015. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/27/2015. Replies due by 11/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brandon K. Fields, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Fields, Brandon) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
October 14, 2015 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is: Certificate/Proof of Service.Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #137 MOTION to Dismiss Certificate of Service filed by Mark Brian (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is: Proposed Order. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #136 MOTION to Dismiss [Proposed] Order filed by Mark Brian (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is: Declaration in Support. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #135 MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Stephen J Brooks w Exhibits filed by Mark Brian (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is: Memorandum in Support. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #134 MOTION to Dismiss Memo of Points and Authorities filed by Mark Brian (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 13, 2015 Filing 137 Certificate of Service re: ( #133 ) Motion to Dismiss filed by Mark Brian. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/27/2015. Replies due by 11/3/2015. (Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 10/13/2015) Modified on 10/14/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2015 Filing 136 [Proposed] Order re: ( #133 ) Motion to Dismiss filed by Mark Brian. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/27/2015. Replies due by 11/3/2015. (Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 10/13/2015) Modified on 10/14/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2015 Filing 135 Declaration of Stephen J Brooks w Exhibits re: ( #133 ) Motion to Dismiss filed by Mark Brian. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/27/2015. Replies due by 11/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Brooks Decl, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Brooks Decl)(Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 10/13/2015) Modified on 10/14/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2015 Filing 134 Memo of Points and Authorities re: ( #133 ) Motion to Dismiss filed by Mark Brian. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/27/2015. Replies due by 11/3/2015. (Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 10/13/2015) Modified on 10/14/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2015 Filing 133 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Mark Brian. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/27/2015. Replies due by 11/3/2015. (Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 13, 2015 Filing 132 Proposed Order re #131 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Barack Obama. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 13, 2015 Filing 131 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Barack Obama. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/30/2015. Replies due by 11/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Claire de Chazal)(Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 8, 2015 Filing 130 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF MARK P. EDSON IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Michele Schroeder. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/22/2015. Replies due by 10/29/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS A & B TO MOTION TO DISMISS)(Edson, Mark) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 129 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by California State Bar/ Director. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/16/2015. Replies due by 10/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torres-Gil, Mark) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
September 24, 2015 Filing 128 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #127 Notice of Objection and Opposition to Judgment of Dismissal Request, #126 Second Amended Complaint (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 24, 2015 Filing 127 Notice of Objection and Opposition To Judgment of Dismissal Request re #123 Proposed Order Re: Judgment of Dismissal by Kenneth L. Campbell. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 24, 2015 Filing 126 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byKenneth L. Campbell. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 23, 2015 Filing 125 Letter from Counsel Stephen J. Brooks of Supple & Canvel, LLP. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO FILE LETTER REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; AND DENYING REQUEST (addressing #123 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/22/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2015: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2015 Filing 123 Proposed Order Re: Judgment of Dismissal by J. Alvarez, Mark Brian. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER RE #120 PLAINTIFF'S "NOTICE OF OBJECTION AND REQUEST TO VACATE UNLAWFUL ORDERS." Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/8/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2015: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2015 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #120 Notice of Objection and Request to Vacate Unlawful Orders (Rule 72 and 73 FRCP). (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 8, 2015 Filing 120 Notice of Objection and Request to Vacate Unlawful Orders (Rule 72 and 73 FRCP) by Kenneth L. Campbell. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER STRIKING #111 PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED AUGUST 24, 2015; AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FIING AMENDED PLEADING IN CONFORMANCE WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE GREWAL'S ORDER, THIS COURT'S CIVIL LOCAL RULES, AND THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/3/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2015: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2015 Remarks: Clerk mailed copy of Reassignment Order to Plaintiff at the address of: 460 N. Shoreline Bl. #117, Mountain View, CA 94043 (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 9/1/2015. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/31/2015. (hrllc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 28, 2015 Remarks: Clerk mailed copy of Reassignment Order to Plaintiff at the address of: 460 N. Shoreline Bl. #117, Mountain View, CA 94043 (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 8/28/2015. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk of Court shall reassign this matter forthwith. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/27/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 27, 2015 Remarks: Clerk mailed copy of Reassignment order to Plaintiff to the address of: 460 N. Shoreline, Bl. #117, Mountain View, CA 94043 (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 8/27/2015. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 26, 2015. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2015: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofrS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2015 Filing 112 Joinder re #111 Amended Complaint, by Kenneth L. Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 24, 2015 Filing 111 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barack Obama, Linda Wiley, Lidia Breslavez, Notisha Zayndenberg, Francisco Aguilar, Maria Ivanchuk, Paul S. Grewal, Karen B. Goldberg, Karen B. Goldberg. Filed by Kenneth L. Campbell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 17, 2015 Filing 110 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF MAILED TO KENNETH CAMPBELL by Michele Schroeder. (Edson, Mark) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF, AS AMENDED by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting #107 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2015: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2015 Filing 108 RESPONSE (re #107 MOTION ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF ) (Joinder in motion) filed byBarack Obama. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 14, 2015 Filing 107 MOTION ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF filed by Michele Schroeder. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/28/2015. Replies due by 9/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Edson, Mark) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
May 19, 2015 Filing 106 Notice re plaintiff's failure to file amended complaint re: #105 ORDER (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 5/19/2015) Modified on 5/19/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTIONS FOR REMOVAL, JOINDER AND VACATION AND WITHDRAWAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #22 ; granting #30 ; denying #33 ; denying #46 ; denying #68 ; granting #81 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2015: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2014 Filing 104 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Conference held on 12/2/2014. Case management conference deferred pending ruling on motions. Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2014 re ECF No. #18 Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #22 Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #30 Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #33 Petition for Removal, ECF No. #42 Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #46 Motion to Add Defendant, ECF No. #56 Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #68 Motion to Withdraw & Vacate Consent & ECF No. #81 Motion to Dismiss. The court dismisses the following Defendants: MP Shoreline Associates, Martyn Ray, Martha Ray, Los Altos Sub-Acute, J. Alvarez, Mark Brian, SC Social Service, Robert Brizuela & Patricia Melenudo. Motions to Dismiss #18 , #42 , #56 GRANTED. The court takes matters #22 , #30 , #33 , #46 , #68 and #81 under submission; written order to be issued. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. Plaintiff present: No appearance. Defendant Attorney(s) present: Mark Edson, Stephen Brooks, Claire Cormier, Susan Phan, Meghan Loisel & Steven Mehlman. Also present (telephonically): Brandon Fields. This is a Text Only Minute Entry (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/2/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 103 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fields, Brandon) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT DECEMBER 2, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #101 . Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2014 Filing 101 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONE APPEARANCE filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1( Proposed) Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fields, Brandon) (Filed on 11/26/2014) Text modified on 12/2/2014 conforming to posted document caption (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting #96 . Attorney Kennedy Park Richardson terminated. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2014 Filing 99 CLERK'S NOTICE Advancing Time on 12/2/2014 Motion Hearing & Case Management Conference (In Re: Docket Nos. #18 , #22 , #30 , #33 , #42 , #46 , #56 , #68 and #81 ): 12/2/2014 10:00 AM Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference is advanced to 9:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2014 Filing 98 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/28/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2014 Filing 97 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by J. Alvarez, Mark Brian. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 23, 2014 Filing 96 MOTION to Substitute Attorney and [proposed] order filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fields, Brandon) (Filed on 11/23/2014) Modified on 11/24/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2014 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patricia Melenudo re #94 Case Management Statement (Loisel, Meghan) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 20, 2014 Filing 94 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Defendant Patricia Melenudo's Case Management Statement filed by Patricia Melenudo. (Loisel, Meghan) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 20, 2014 Filing 93 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT of Federal Defendants filed by Sylvia M. Burwell. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 92 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michele Schroeder. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Edson, Mark) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 91 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by California State Bar/ Director. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Phan, Susan) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 90 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Case Management Conference Statement of Defendant; and Proof of Service filed by MP Shoreline Associates. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Mehlman, Steven) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 89 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ; Declaration & POS filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Richardson, Kennedy) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 88 REPLY (re #81 MOTION to Dismiss by Federal Defendants Sylvia Burwell and Barack Obama ) filed bySylvia M. Burwell. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 87 SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kenneth L. Campbell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 86 RESPONSE (re #81 MOTION to Dismiss by Federal Defendants Sylvia Burwell and Barack Obama ) filed byKenneth L. Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. re #84 Answer to Complaint (Richardson, Kennedy) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 84 Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Richardson, Kennedy) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 23, 2014 Filing 83 CLERK'S NOTICE Resetting 10/28/2014 Motions and 11/25/2014 Case Management Conference: 10/28/2014 Motions (In Re: Docket Nos. #18 , #22 , #30 , #33 , #42 , #46 , #56 and #68 ) and 11/25/2014 Case Management Conference are reset to 12/2/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2014 Filing 82 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sylvia M. Burwell.. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss by Federal Defendants Sylvia Burwell and Barack Obama for failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and that the Court lacks jurisdiction over claims against the President. filed by Sylvia M. Burwell. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 11/7/2014. Replies due by 11/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Claire D. de Chazal)(Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 10/21/2014) Modified on 10/23/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2014 Filing 80 informational Brief filed byKenneth L. Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 79 CLERK'S NOTICE Advancing 11/25/2014 Motion to Dismiss Hearing, advancing #56 MOTION to Dismiss: 11/25/2014 Motion Hearing is advanced for 10/28/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2014 Filing 78 REPLY (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byCalifornia State Bar/ Director. (Phan, Susan) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 16, 2014 Filing 77 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kenneth L. Campbell as to Robert Brizuela. WAS NOT ABLE TO SERVE, POLICY FOR SC COUNTY DOES NOT PERMIT - ADMINISTRATION WAS NOT ABLE TO ACCEPT BECAUSE THEY CAN'T ACCEPT ON BEHALF OF AN INDIVIDUAL - COULD NOT LOCATE INDIVIDUAL (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Steven J. Mehlman Ed Kunnes to Steven Mehlman (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mehlman, Steven) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patricia Melenudo re #71 Reply to Opposition/Response (Loisel, Meghan) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 71 REPLY (re #56 MOTION to Dismiss ) Defendant Patricia Melenudo's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed byPatricia Melenudo. (Loisel, Meghan) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 76 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth L. Campbell. Venesha Clachar served on 9/30/2014, answer due 10/21/2014. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 75 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth L. Campbell. California State Bar/ Director served on 9/16/2014, answer due 10/7/2014. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #69 Notice (Other), #71 Reply to Opposition/Response, #70 Opposition/Response to Motion (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 70 OBJECTION (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint) filed byKenneth L. Campbell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE by Kenneth L. Campbell (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 68 MOTION to Withdraw #60 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, MOTION to Vacate #62 Order filed by Kenneth L. Campbell. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/28/2014. Replies due by 11/4/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 67 REPLY (re #56 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJ. Alvarez, Mark Brian. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 66 RESPONSE (re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byKenneth L. Campbell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 65 RESPONSE (re #56 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof ) filed byKenneth L. Campbell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 64 Letter from Kenneth L. Campbell dated 10/6/14. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL AND GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 6, 2014 re #46 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE: CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 3, 2014 re #4 , #60 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2014 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patricia Melenudo re #57 Proposed Order, #56 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Melenudo's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof (Loisel, Meghan) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 57 Proposed Order re #56 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Melenudo's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof by Patricia Melenudo. (Loisel, Meghan) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Patricia Melenudo. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/15/2014. Replies due by 10/22/2014. (Loisel, Meghan) (Filed on 10/1/2014) Modified on 10/8/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2014 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #59 Notice of current and correct address (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 60 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenneth L. Campbell.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 59 Notice of current and correct address by Kenneth L. Campbell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 10/1/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF)
September 29, 2014 Filing 55 CLERK'S NOTICE Resetting Motions, resetting #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution, #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #30 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #33 MOTION Petition for Removal of State Administrative proceedings & #46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel: 9/30/2014 10:00 AM Motions are reset to 10/28/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofrS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2014 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patricia Melenudo re #53 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Loisel, Meghan) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 53 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Patricia Melenudo.. (Loisel, Meghan) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 52 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martha Ray.. (Kunnes, Edward) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 51 DECLARATION in Opposition to #49 Opposition/Response to Motion, Amended Declaration of Susan Phan filed byCalifornia State Bar/ Director. (Related document(s) #49 ) (Phan, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 50 ERRATA re #49 Opposition/Response to Motion, by California State Bar/ Director. (Phan, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 49 RESPONSE (re #46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byCalifornia State Bar/ Director. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan Phan, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Phan, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 23, 2014 Remark - clerk mailed the page referencing - re: LR 3-11 - Failure to Notify of address change. (cv, COURT STAFF)
September 23, 2014 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell On September 20, 2014 I SERVED copy of re #47 Opposition/Response to Motion, #46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014) Modified on 9/23/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2014 Filing 45 Mail sent to to Steven Jeffrey, Mehlman TerBeek LLP at 2125 Oak Grove Rd Ste 125 Walnut Creek, CA 94598-2534 returned as undeliverable re #27 Order, #23 Clerk's Notice re: Failure to E-File and Register. RETURN TO SENDER - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD returned as undeliverable re #27 Order. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 47 OPPOSITION (re #30 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT ) filed byKenneth L. Campbell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Kenneth L. Campbell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J. Alvarez, Mark Brian re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patricia Melenudo re #41 Notice (Other) (Loisel, Meghan) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by J. Alvarez, Mark Brian. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/2/2014. Replies due by 10/9/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Appendix CONSENT OR DECLINATION, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brooks, Stephen) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE by Patricia Melenudo Notice of Acceptance of Service of Summons (Loisel, Meghan) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 40 CLERK'S NOTICE Resetting Time on September 30, 2014 Motion Hearing, resetting time as to #30 MOTION to Dismiss: 9/30/2014 9:00 AM Motion Hearing is reset to 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MP SHORELINE ASSOCIATES REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT SEPTEMBER 30, 2014 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #38 : Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2014 Filing 38 First MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by MP Shoreline Associates. (Kunnes, Edward) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 15, 2014 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Petition for removal by Kenneth L. Campbell (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 36 RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution ) filed by Kenneth L. Campbell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 11, 2014 Remark - clerk mailed Information re: Maintain/update ECF account and Updating contact information to Attorney Steven Jeffrey Mehlman, and Edward Allen Kunnes at Kimball, Tirey & St. John LLP, 500 Ygnacio Valley Road, Suite 290, Walnut Creek, CA 94596 (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 11, 2014 Filing 34 Mail sent to Steven Jeffrey Mehlman, Mehlman TerBeek LLP, 2125 Oak Grove Rd Ste, 125 Walnut Creek, CA 94598-2534 returned as undeliverable re #24 Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing, RETURN TO SENDER - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth L. Campbell. J. Alvarez served on 8/28/2014, answer due 9/18/2014; Patricia Melenudo served on 8/28/2014, answer due 9/18/2014; Martha Ray served on 8/29/2014, answer due 9/19/2014; Michele Schroeder served on 8/28/2014, answer due 9/18/2014; Mark Brian served on 8/28/2014, answer due 9/18/2014. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 33 Petition for Removal of State Administrative proceedings subject to Judicial Review. filed by Kenneth L. Campbell. Responses due by 9/24/2014. Replies due by 10/1/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Non-Receipt of Opposition to #22 Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Phan, Susan) (Filed on 9/10/2014) Modified on 9/10/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2014 Filing 31 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by MP Shoreline Associates.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Kunnes, Edward) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 5, 2014 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT filed by Michele Schroeder. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/19/2014. Replies due by 9/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL, #3CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Edson, Mark) (Filed on 9/5/2014) Modified on 9/8/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2014 Filing 29 Mail sent to Steven Jeffrey Mehlman TerBeek LLP at 2125 Oak Grove Rd Ste 125 Walnut Creek, CA 94598-2534 returned as undeliverable re #27 Order, #23 Clerk's Notice re: Failure to E-File and Register. RETURN TO SENDER - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD (Attachments: #1 clerk's notice, register/pacer)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 27, 2014 Filing 28 Letter from Kenneth L. Campbell dated 8/25/14. re: Process of Summons (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014) Modified on 8/27/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REGARDING FAILURE TO E-FILE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 25, 2014. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2014 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California State Bar/ Director re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Phan, Susan) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California State Bar/ Director.. (Phan, Susan) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, continuing #18 MOTION to Dismiss: 9/9/2014 Motion Hearing is continued to 9/30/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2014 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 21, 2014 Remark - clerk mailed ECF registration form along with #23 CLERKS SECOND NOTICE re: Failure to E-File document numbers #18, #19, #20 - to Steven Jeffrey Mehlman, Law Firm Mehlman TerBeek LLP 2125 Oak Grove Rd Ste 125 Walnut Creek, CA 94598-2534 (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 23 CLERKS SECOND NOTICE re: Failure to E-File document numbers #18, #19, #20. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by California State Bar/ Director. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/4/2014. Replies due by 9/11/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Consent, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Phan, Susan) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 20 Proposed Order re #18 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by MP Shoreline Associates. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2014 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed byMP Shoreline Associates. (Related document(s) #18 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted,or in the alternative to MOTION to provide a more definite statement. filed by MP Shoreline Associates. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/2/2014. Replies due by 9/9/2014. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2014 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth L. Campbell re #3 Case Management Scheduling Order, #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kenneth L. Campbell. Service waived by Martha Ray/ Shorebreeze Apartments waiver sent on 8/5/2014, answer due 10/6/2014. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Barack Obama, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Sylvia M. Burwell. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Martha Ray. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Michele Schroeder. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to California State Bar/ Director. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Patricia Melenudo. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Robert Brizuela. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to J. Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Venesha Clachar. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #2 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 5 Letter from Kenneth L. Campbell dated 7/14/14. Accompanying this letter is a proposed Summons directed to Mark Brian, Executive Director, Los Altos Sub Acute. Please substitute this Summons form for the Summons form re J. Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Mark Brian, Exc. Director)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/30/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenneth L. Campbell.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/25/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth L. Campbell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sylvia M. Burwell, California State Bar/ Director, Kaiser Health Foundation, Barack Obama, J. Alvarez, Robert Brizuela, Patricia Melenudo, Shorebreeze Apts, M. Schroeder, . Filed by Kenneth L. Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 8/27/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Obama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Notisha Zayndenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lidia Breslavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Schroeder
Represented By: Mark Perry Edson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venesha Clachar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Brizuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Bar/ Director
Represented By: Mark A Torres-Gil
Represented By: Susan Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Melenudo
Represented By: Meghan F. Loisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barack Obama
Represented By: Claire T. Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul S. Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia M. Burwell
Represented By: Claire T. Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen B. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Alvarez
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MP Shoreline Associates
Represented By: Edward Allen Kunnes
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Mehlman
Represented By: Steven J. Mehlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Ivanchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brian
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Ray
Represented By: Edward Allen Kunnes
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Mehlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Kareem Fields
Represented By: Kennedy Park Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MP Shoreline Associates a California Limited Partnership doing business as Shorebreeze Apartment
Represented By: Edward Allen Kunnes
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Mehlman
Represented By: Steven J. Mehlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?