Sepehry-Fard v. Nationstar Mortgage L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Fareed Sepehry-Fard
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage L.L.C., Jay Bray, Harold Lewis, Stacey Roberson, Clear Recon Corp, John D. Duncan, GreenPoint Mortgage Funding, Inc., Recon Trust Company N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, California Reconveyance Company, Marin Conveyancing Corp and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv03218
Filed: July 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh denying 45 Motion for Sanctions; granting 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting 7 Motion to Dismiss; granting 9 Motion to Dismiss; granting 10 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/16/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying (154 in 5:13-cv-04535-EJD) Motion to Relate Case. With regard to Defendant California Reconveyance Company's administrative motion to consider whether this above-entitled action is related to Sepehry-Fard v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Case No. 5:14-cv-03218 LHK, the court has reviewed the motion and has determined the cases are not related and that reassignment shall not occur. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/19/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sepehry-Fard v. Nationstar Mortgage L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fareed Sepehry-Fard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael Gerald Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Bray
Represented By: Michael Gerald Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Lewis
Represented By: Michael Gerald Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Roberson
Represented By: Michael Gerald Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Duncan
Represented By: Michael Gerald Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GreenPoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Gerald Cross
Represented By: Joseph W. Guzzetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recon Trust Company N.A.
Represented By: Michael Gerald Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Michael Gerald Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Represented By: Anne Pellegrom Daher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin Conveyancing Corp
Represented By: Michael Gerald Cross
Represented By: Joseph W. Guzzetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Gerald Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?