Next Generation Systems Inc. v. Brocade Communications Systems Inc.
Plaintiff: Next Generation Systems Inc.
Defendant: Brocade Communications Systems Inc
Case Number: 5:2014cv03366
Filed: July 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting #53 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 30, 2014 Filing 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL filed by Next Generation Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Storm, Paul) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 52 MOTION to Amend re: #44 SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Next Generation Systems Inc.. Responses due by 12/26/2014. Replies due by 1/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Storm, Paul) (Filed on 12/12/2014) Modified on 12/12/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2014 Filing 51 ANSWER to Amended Complaint re #46 , First COUNTERCLAIM against Next Generation Systems Inc. byBrocade Communications Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Answer and Counterclaim)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 12/4/2014) Linkage added on 12/5/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2014 Filing 50 ADR CERTIFICATION BY ARTIES AND COUNSEL (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 12/1/2014) Modified on 12/3/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 2/13/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL OF STATE LAW CLAIMS AND AMENDMENT re #47 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 18, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 17, 2014 Filing 47 Proposed Order re #45 Stipulation For Dismissal And Amendment by Brocade Communications Systems Inc. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 46 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brocade Communications Systems Inc. Filed by Next Generation Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Storm, Paul) (Filed on 11/13/2014) Modified on 11/13/2014 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2014 Filing 45 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND AMENDMENT filed by Next Generation Systems Inc.. (Storm, Paul) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
October 30, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re #44 Order: Tutorial Hearing set for 4/30/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Markman hearing set for 5/7/2015 at 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CASE SCHEDULING ORDER re #42 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 30, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 43 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 10/8/2014 re: #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) & Case Management Conference. The court takes matter under submission; the court will issue a written opinion. Jury Trial set for 6/13/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Case management scheduling order to be issued. (Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/8/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 42 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Next Generation Systems Inc.. (Wei, David) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Entities by Next Generation Systems Inc. (Wei, David) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 24, 2014 Remark - clerk mailed the ECF Registration Information Handout to Attorney, Sarah M. Paxson along with copy of ORDER #33 to GARDERE WYNNE SEWELL LLP 1601 Elm St., Ste. 3000, Dallas, TX 75201 (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014) Modified text on 9/24/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2014 Filing 40 REPLY (re #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) ) filed byBrocade Communications Systems Inc. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 23, 2014 Filing 39 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wei, David) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #37 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Stamatios Stamoulis and Richard Charles Weinblatt terminated. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 37 MOTION to Substitute Attorney and [Proposed] Order filed by Next Generation Systems Inc.. (Wei, David) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by Brocade Communications Systems Inc (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by Next Generation Systems Inc. (Wei, David) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting #32 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting #31 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 16, 2014 Filing 32 Application for Admission of Attorney Paul V. Storm for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice and (Proposed) Order ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8925205.) filed by Next Generation Systems Inc.. (Wei, David) (Filed on 9/16/2014) Text modified on 9/17/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2014 Filing 31 Application for Admission of Attorney Sarah M. Paxson for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice and (Proposed) Order ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8925193.) filed by Next Generation Systems Inc. (Wei, David) (Filed on 9/16/2014) Text modified on 9/17/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2014 Filing 30 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS PARTIAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (re #27 filed by Next Generation Systems Inc. (Wei, David) (Filed on 9/16/2014) Text modified on 9/17/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2014 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing October 7, 2014 Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference, re #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial): Due to the court's unavailability, the 10/7/2014 Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference are continued to 10/8/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING SEPTEMBER 30, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 9/30/2014 Case Management Conference is reset to 10/7/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) filed by Brocade Communications Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/16/2014. Replies due by 9/23/2014. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Next Generation Systems Inc... (Wei, David) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Wei, Jr (Wei, David) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #18 . Attorney Philip A. Rovner terminated (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Annette L. Hurst (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RE: COURT DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO EITHER CONSENT OR DECLINE TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: 12/23/2014 Case Management Conference is advanced to 9/30/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2014. Each party who has not already done so shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by 8/25/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Siddhartha M. Venkatesan (Venkatesan, Siddhartha) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brocade Communications Systems Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Marie Mingrone (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION to Substitute Attorney and [proposed] Order by Denise Marie Mingrone (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 8/11/2014) Modified on 8/11/2014, (incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2014 Filing 17 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/16/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:14-cv-00566. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 24, 2014 Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California. (ntl)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Brocade Communications Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/24/14. (ntl)
July 10, 2014 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California, #13 Response to Motion by Brocade Communications Systems Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
July 7, 2014 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Next Generation Systems Inc.. (Weinblatt, Richard)
June 20, 2014 Filing 12 DECLARATION re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California DECLARATION OF STEVE WILSON IN SUPPORT OF BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER by Brocade Communications Systems Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 20, 2014 Filing 11 DECLARATION re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California DECLARATION OF JAMES E. PARSONS IN SUPPORT OF BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER by Brocade Communications Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rovner, Philip)
June 20, 2014 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by Brocade Communications Systems Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2014. (Rovner, Philip)
June 20, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California - filed by Brocade Communications Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 D. Del. LR 7.1.1 Certification)(Rovner, Philip)
June 19, 2014 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Brocade Communications Systems Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 19, 2014 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Defenses by Brocade Communications Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rovner, Philip)
May 30, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal ( R Touhey Myer) by Next Generation Systems Inc. (Weinblatt, Richard)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME time for Brocade to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Next Generation Systems' Complaint to June 20, 2014 filed by Brocade Communications Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/15/14. (ntl)
May 12, 2014 Filing 5 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME time for Brocade to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Next Generation Systems' Complaint to June 20, 2014 - filed by Brocade Communications Systems Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
May 7, 2014 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 2, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Next Generation Systems Inc.. Brocade Communications Systems Inc. served on 4/30/2014, answer due 5/21/2014. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 30, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Brocade Communications Systems Inc. on 4/30/2014. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (jeb, )
April 29, 2014 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7385982 B2;. (jeb, )
April 29, 2014 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jeb, )
April 29, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Brocade Communications Systems Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1507493.) - filed by Next Generation Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jeb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Next Generation Systems Inc. v. Brocade Communications Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brocade Communications Systems Inc
Represented By: Annette L. Hurst
Represented By: Siddhartha M. Venkatesan
Represented By: Denise Marie Mingrone
Represented By: Philip A. Rovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Next Generation Systems Inc.
Represented By: Paul V. Storm
Represented By: Sarah Marie Paxson
Represented By: David T. Wei, Jr.
Represented By: R. Touhey Myer
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?