Red Pine Point LLC v. Apple Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Red Pine Point LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc and Magnolia Pictures LLC
Case Number: 5:2014cv03493
Filed: August 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2014 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RE: COURT DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO EITHER CONSENT OR DECLINE TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: 12/16/2014 Case Management Conference is reset for 9/9/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2014. Each party who has not already done so shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by 8/20/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 5, 2014 Filing 26 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 5, 2014 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:14-cv-00292. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 30, 2014 Filing 24 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California in San Francisco the electronic case file via email. (ph, )
July 23, 2014 Filing 23 MAILED Patent report with certified copy of order dated 7/16/2014 to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (mgh, )
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Transferring Cases to Northern District of California. Having considered all the factors presented by the parties, as to these related cases, Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) 14 is granted. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim is mooted by this transfer and may be presented to the transferee court. Counsel need not appear before this court on July 29, 2014. These related and consolidated cases are transferred to the Northern District of California in San Francisco. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 7/16/2014. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 15, 2014 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Magnolia Pictures LLC (Cavan, Marc)
July 15, 2014 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. (Cavan, Marc)
July 15, 2014 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Magnolia Pictures LLC(Cavan, Marc)
July 15, 2014 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Apple Inc.(Cavan, Marc)
June 30, 2014 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing date of 7/1/2014 before Judge Zagel is stricken.Mailed notice (jms, )
May 22, 2014 Filing 16 REPLY by Defendants Apple Inc., Magnolia Pictures LLC to motion to transfer case 14 To the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit U, # 2 Exhibit V, # 3 Exhibit W)(Cavan, Marc)
May 8, 2014 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Apple Inc., Magnolia Pictures LLC in support of motion to transfer case 14 To the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Cavan, Marc)
May 8, 2014 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Apple Inc., Magnolia Pictures LLC to transfer case To the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Cavan, Marc)
May 6, 2014 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Apple Inc., Magnolia Pictures LLC by Marc Andrew Cavan (Cavan, Marc)
April 29, 2014 Filing 12 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable James F. Holderman for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/29/14.(rp, )
April 23, 2014 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Continue the Status Hearing 9 is granted. Status and motion hearing set for 4/24/14 are stricken. Status hearing reset for 7/1/14 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
April 21, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Charles Jarvis for presentment of motion to continue 9 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 4/24/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Jarvis, Stephen)
April 21, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC to continue Status Hearing (UNOPPOSED MOTION) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jarvis, Stephen)
February 5, 2014 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing set for 4/24/2014 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
January 28, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Apple Inc., Magnolia Pictures LLC (pg, )
January 17, 2014 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC by Stephen Charles Jarvis (Jarvis, Stephen)
January 17, 2014 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC by Matthew Michael Wawrzyn (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
January 16, 2014 Filing 5 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (et, )
January 16, 2014 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable James B. Zagel. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown. (meg, )
January 15, 2014 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC by Joseph J Siprut (Siprut, Joseph)
January 15, 2014 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Red Pine Point LLC by Melanie K. Nelson (Nelson, Melanie)
January 15, 2014 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nelson, Melanie)
January 15, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Red Pine Point LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9107394. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Nelson, Melanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Pine Point LLC v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Pine Point LLC
Represented By: Todd Christopher Atkins
Represented By: Stephen Charles Jarvis
Represented By: Melanie K. Nelson
Represented By: Joseph J Siprut
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: James R. Batchelder
Represented By: Marc Andrew Cavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnolia Pictures LLC
Represented By: James R. Batchelder
Represented By: Marc Andrew Cavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?