Verse Two Properties, LLC v. Hanggi Manufacturing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Verse Two Properties, LLC
Defendant: Hanggi Manufacturing, Inc., Bace Industries, LLC, Bace Capital Partners, LLC, Medplast Holdings, Inc., United Plastics Group, Inc. and Medplast Fremont, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv03765
Filed: August 19, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2016 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/18/2016 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/11/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 23, 2016 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ***E-FILED IN ERROR PLEASE SEE ECF DKT. 133 *** ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/18/2016 at 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/12/2016. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/23/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2016 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties. Joint Case Management Conference Statement (Dkt. No. 128 ), the court has determined that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Manageme nt Conference scheduled for May 19, 2016, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on August 25, 2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before August 18, 2016 Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
January 19, 2016 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The deadline for the completion of mediation previously set for March 10, 2016 is CONTINUED to 4/14/2016. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/5/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/19/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
November 13, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 60 Third Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; granting 68 Third Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Third Party Plaintiff's sixth claim for negligence and seventh claim for negligence per se are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/13/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 10, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 37 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 83 92 Motions to Dismiss. The motion hearing scheduled for November 12, 2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/10/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
February 17, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court has determined that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for February 19, 2015, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on April 23, 201 5. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement which includes, inter alia, proposed case management deadlines, on or before April 16, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/17/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
January 26, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 53 Notice (Other) of Dismissal of Complaint, Without Prejudice, as to Defendants Bace Industries, LLC, Bace Capital Partners, LLC, Medplast Holdings, Inc. and United Plastics Group, Inc. filed by Verse Two Properties, LLC. Hanggi Manufacturing, Inc. (A Delaware corporation), Medplast Holdings, Inc. (a Delaware corporation), United Plastics Group, Inc. (a Delaware corporation), Bace Capital Partners, LLC (a Colorado limited liability company) and Bace Industries, LLC (a Colorado limited liability company) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/26/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verse Two Properties, LLC v. Hanggi Manufacturing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verse Two Properties, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanggi Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley R Cahoon
Represented By: Tracy Hugh Fowler
Represented By: Colin R Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bace Industries, LLC
Represented By: Bradley R Cahoon
Represented By: Tracy Hugh Fowler
Represented By: Colin R Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bace Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Bradley R Cahoon
Represented By: Tracy Hugh Fowler
Represented By: Colin R Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medplast Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley R Cahoon
Represented By: Tracy Hugh Fowler
Represented By: Colin R Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Plastics Group, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley R Cahoon
Represented By: Tracy Hugh Fowler
Represented By: Colin R Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medplast Fremont, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley R Cahoon
Represented By: Tracy Hugh Fowler
Represented By: Colin R Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?