Mata et al v. Manpower Inc. / California Peninsula et al
Plaintiff: Juventina Mata, Claudia Padilla and Lesli Guido
Defendant: Manpower Inc. / California Peninsula, Manpowergroup US Inc.,, Manpower Inc., Manpowergroup Public Sector Inc., and Manpower US Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv03787
Filed: August 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 192 Motion for Attorney Fees.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Order Regarding Billing Records and Objection Forms. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/4/17. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 188 Supplemental Renewed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Order Denying Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/22/16. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Order by Judge Lucy Koh Denying 175 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Order Regarding Preliminary Approval Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 09/01/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Order by Judge Lucy Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part 134 Motion to Strike. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Amended Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part 48 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 03/14/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
January 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting in part and denying in part 48 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Case Management Order and Order by Judge Lucy Koh denying Plaintiffs' 140 Ex Parte Application to Augment Summary Judgment Record (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 37 Discovery Dispute Joint Report 2. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 33 Discovery Dispute Joint Report 1 and 34 Response. (hrllc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh denying 52 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 71 Motion to Strike; and requiring Parties to File Renewed Opposition and Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 7/29/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED ORDER Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information 35 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/26/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015) Modified on 6/26/2015 (hrllc1, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 04/15/2015. (lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 2/18/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 2/12/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 Stipulation, filed by Manpower Inc., Manpowergroup Public Sector Inc., Manpower Inc. / California Peninsula, Manpower US Inc., Manpowergroup US Inc.,. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/5/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mata et al v. Manpower Inc. / California Peninsula et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpower Inc. / California Peninsula
Represented By: Sabrina Alexis Beldner
Represented By: Sylvia Jihae Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpowergroup US Inc.,
Represented By: Sabrina Alexis Beldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpower Inc.
Represented By: Sabrina Alexis Beldner
Represented By: Sylvia Jihae Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpowergroup Public Sector Inc.,
Represented By: Sabrina Alexis Beldner
Represented By: Sylvia Jihae Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpower US Inc.
Represented By: Sabrina Alexis Beldner
Represented By: Sylvia Jihae Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juventina Mata
Represented By: David E Cameron
Represented By: Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Charles Swanston
Represented By: Patrick Darryn Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Padilla
Represented By: David E Cameron
Represented By: Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Charles Swanston
Represented By: Patrick Darryn Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesli Guido
Represented By: David E Cameron
Represented By: Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Charles Swanston
Represented By: Patrick Darryn Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?