Nanavati v. Adecco USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Rajan Nanavati
Defendant: Adecco USA, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv04145
Filed: September 15, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 23 MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 6/30/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
April 13, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 13 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; STAYING ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION. All deadlines and hearings previously set in this case are hereby VACATED. The parties shall file by 10/15/2015 a two-page letter updating the Court as to the status of arbitration. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 4/13/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
January 7, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 16 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 1/7/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nanavati v. Adecco USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajan Nanavati
Represented By: Kevin R Allen
Represented By: Daniel Velton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adecco USA, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Westcott O'Dell
Represented By: Julie Erin Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?