Parenti et al v. County Of Monterey et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Parenti, D.P-O. and Susan Parenti
Defendant: County of Monterey, Scott Miller, Collins, California Forensic Medical Group and Taylor Fithian, M.D.
Case Number: 5:2014cv05481
Filed: December 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER APPROVING 136 SETTLEMENT OF MINOR'S CLAIMS. Dismissal or status report due on or before April 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/18/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 100 DEPUTY COLLINS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/6/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ADOPTING 88 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART 76 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE NON-RETAINED EXPERTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/6/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 76 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE DUPLICATIVE AND INADMISSIBLE EXPERT TESTIMONY; AND REFERRING 76 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE ISSUES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SUSAN VAN KEULEN FOR DISPOSITION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/3/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE DEFENDANT TAYLOR FITHIAN, M.D.'S EX PARTE REQUEST TO BE AVAILABLE BY TELEPHONE AT MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCTOBER 30, 2015 [42-2]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/28/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 29, 2015 re 33 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parenti et al v. County Of Monterey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Parenti
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Lori Rifkin
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Represented By: Mohammad K Tajsar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.P-O.
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Lori Rifkin
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Represented By: Mohammad K Tajsar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Parenti
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Lori Rifkin
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Represented By: Mohammad K Tajsar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Monterey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Fithian, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?