Tenerelli v. Lockheed Martin Space Systems Company et al
Plaintiff: Dominick Tenerelli
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Space Systems Company and Lockheed Martin Corporation
Case Number: 5:2015cv00012
Filed: January 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/7/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 37 LAW OFFICES OF TANYA GOMERMAN'S EX PARTE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORDS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/3/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL AND PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/20/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 23 DEFENDANT LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO ASSERT A COUNTERCLAIM FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/24/0015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER VACATING Case Management Conference and SETTING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/7/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tenerelli v. Lockheed Martin Space Systems Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Tenerelli
Represented By: Tanya Gomerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Space Systems Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Michael W. Foster
Represented By: Michael Eugene Wilbur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?