Hudson v. Richmond Police Department
Plaintiff: Toriano Germaine Hudson
Defendant: Richmond Police Department
Case Number: 5:2015cv00787
Filed: February 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: PSLC HHL
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/19/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/23/2017. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER STRIKING PLEADING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE 60 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS 49 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER 37 38 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Richmond Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toriano Germaine Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmond Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?