Hunter v. Lenovo (United States) Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David Hunter
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Superfish, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv00819
Filed: February 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Transferring Case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to centralize this litigation in that district or, in the alternative, the Northern District of California to be part of the MDL 2624. It is Therefore Ordered that the action listed on Sch edule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California, and, with the consent of court, assigned to the Honorable Ronald M. Whyte for coordination or consolidated pretrial processing. Signed by the MDL panel on 6/9/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
April 7, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 17 for Continuance of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/7/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
March 19, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related. The Clerk shall reassign the case to Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Counsins is no longer assigned to the case. All pending dates are vacated and a Case Management Conference is set for 6/19/2015 10:30 AM before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/19/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Lenovo (United States) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Represented By: Daniel James Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superfish, Inc.
Represented By: Rodger R. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hunter
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: J. Dominick Larry
Represented By: James Dominick Larry
Represented By: Samuel Lasser
Represented By: Amir Cheyenne Missaghi
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?