Cutlip v. Deutche Bank National Trust Company for the Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust Pass-Through Certificates 2007-7
Plaintiff: William Cutlip
Defendant: Deutche Bank National Trust Company for the Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust Pass-Through Certificates 2007-7
Case Number: 5:2015cv01345
Filed: March 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DECLINING TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/19/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER VACATING HEARING RE 60 MOTION TO VACATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/11/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING 57 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/28/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF SUMMONS, re: 21 . Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/13/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER STRIKING FILINGS re 18 , 19 ; REFERRING PLAINTIFF TO FLASH. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 4/7/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015) Modified on 4/7/2015 (blflc2, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING 2 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 3/27/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/25/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cutlip v. Deutche Bank National Trust Company for the Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust Pass-Through Certificates 2007-7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cutlip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutche Bank National Trust Company for the Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust Pass-Through Certificates 2007-7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?