BladeRoom Group Limited et al v. Facebook, Inc.

Plaintiff: BladeRoom Group Limited and Bripco (UK) Limited
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv01370
Filed: March 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 956 Order granting 892 request for exemplary damages, fees, costs and prejudgment interest. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/11/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 945 ORDER denying 891 Motion to Compel Production of Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/26/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 942 ORDER denying 898 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/3/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 847 ORDER RE: EMERSON'S REQUEST TO "UN-ADMIT" CERTAIN EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE FILED MAY 8, 2018 denying as moot 834 Motion in Limine; granting 835 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/8/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER denying 788 Motion to Strike. The hearing on this motion scheduled for 5/2/2018 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/1/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 786 ORDER RE: OBJECTIONS TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION 73 THOUGH 78. Emerson's objection to RFA 78 is SUSTAINED, and Plaintiffs may not read it at trial. The objection to RFAs 73 to 77 is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/27/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 785 ORDER AFTER JURY TRIAL (DAY 11). Plaintiffs' request to find a waiver of the attorney-client privilege is DENIED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/26/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 781 ORDER AFTER JURY TRIAL (DAY 9). Emerson's objection to Plaintiffs' examination of Eric Wilcox is OVERRULED. Plaintiffs' request to limit Emerson's use of certain documents is therefore DENIED. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/23/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER granting 775 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/16/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER AFTER JURY TRIAL (DAY 2). Facebook's Motion for Mistrial and/or Adjournment and Continuance is DENIED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/5/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 745 REDACTED ORDER re: Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/30/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 737 UNSEALED ORDER re: Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/23/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 515 REDACTED ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 384 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/23/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 510 REDACTED ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 370 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/2/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER denying 363 Motion for Bond. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/4/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER re In Camera Review Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/22/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER Following In Camera Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/30/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 311 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 16. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER Setting Hearing re 305 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 17. Hearing set for 8/9/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel who signed the DDJR will appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/4/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 307 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 14. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER denying 295 Administrative Motion for Leave to Take Additional Depositions. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/12/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 268 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 13. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/11/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Amended Letter of Request re Steve Lobley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/17/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 198 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 9. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 (REDACTED) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 180 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 8. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 REDACTED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 147 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 3. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 167 , 181 Discovery Dispute Joint Report Nos. 5 and 7. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 124 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 176 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 6. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/10/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 21 Stipulation filed by Facebook, Inc. The parties hereby stipulate and agree that the deadline for Defendant Facebook to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, which is currently due May 22, 2015, is extended up to, and including, June 1, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/14/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/14/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)(Correcting ECF Entry 22 )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BladeRoom Group Limited et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BladeRoom Group Limited
Represented By: Alex Reese
Represented By: Stephanie Powers Skaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bripco (UK) Limited
Represented By: Alex Reese
Represented By: Stephanie Powers Skaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew David Caplan
Represented By: Kristine Anne Forderer
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?