Robert Heath v. Google Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Robert Heath
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv01824
Filed: April 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 429 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsey Grunert, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Joint Motion for Final Approval of Collective Action Settlement Agreement, # 4 Unredacted Version of Joint Motion for Final Approval of Collective Action Settlement Agreement, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 428 Joint MOTION for Settlement - Motion for Final Approval of Collective Action Settlement Agreement filed by Cheryl Fillekes. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 8/2/2019. Replies due by 8/9/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cheryl Fillekes, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER APPROVING 426 JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/30/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 426 STATUS REPORT - Joint Status Report Regarding Collective Action Settlement by Cheryl Fillekes. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 425 JOINT STATUS REPORT - Joint Status Report Regarding Collective Action Settlement by Cheryl Fillekes. (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 4/15/2019) Modified on 4/15/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2019 Filing 424 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/20/2018, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 423 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2019. (Related documents(s) 423 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 423 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/20/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER GRANTING 421 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE as to Plaintiff Heath only. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/21/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 421 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Robert Heath. (Patten, Dow) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER VACATING ALL DATES AND STAYING ACTION PENDING SETTLEMENT; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS UPDATE RE SETTLEMENT ON OR BEFORE APRIL 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/15/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 419 STATUS REPORT [JOINT] Regarding Settlement of Plaintiff Robert Heath's Individual Claims by Google LLC. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 418 STATUS REPORT [JOINT] Regarding Collective Action Settlement by Google LLC. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT RE SETTLEMENT OF PLAINTIFF FILLEKES AND OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/10/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT OR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/3/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 20, 2018 Filing 415 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2018 re 407 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of Plaintiff Robert Heath filed by Google LLC.Total Time in Court: 9:02 - 9:49 (47 Minutes). Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Dow Patten. Defendant Attorney: Brian Berty, Thomas Mcinerney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 414 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further settlement conference held on 12/20/2018 re Heath's claims. Matter fully settled, with signed written agreement. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 413 Brief re 412 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Falcone Declaration in support of Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Related document(s) 412 ) (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 406 , 409 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/7/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 411 REPLY (re 407 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of Plaintiff Robert Heath, 409 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Falcone, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 410 AFFIDAVIT re 409 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Brian Ong in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Documents in Opposition to Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Claims of Robert Heath by Google LLC. (Bowman, Lisa) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 409 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Robert Heath. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Dow W. Patten, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Opposition [UNREDACTED], # 4 Exhibit OPPOSITION[REDACTED], # 5 Exhibit A - FRANK TANG DEPOSITION, # 6 Exhibit B - GOOGLE DOCUMENTS, # 7 Exhibit E - BRIAN ONG DEPOSITION)(Patten, Dow) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 408 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 407 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of Plaintiff Robert Heath ) [REDACTED] filed byRobert Heath. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Robert Heath, # 2 Declaration Dow W. Patten, # 3 Exhibit A to Patten Decl., # 4 Exhibit B to Patten Decl., # 5 Exhibit C to Patten Decl., # 6 Exhibit D to Patten Decl., # 7 Exhibit E to Patten Decl.)(Patten, Dow) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 407 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of Plaintiff Robert Heath filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/29/2018. Replies due by 12/6/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian Ong with Exhibit 1, # 2 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Falcone with Exhibits Nos. 1 - 6, # 3 (Proposed) Order Granting Def. Google's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claims of Plaintiff Robert Heath)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian Ong, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Def. Google LLC's Motion to Seal, # 3 [REDACTED] Def. Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claims of Plaintiff Robert Heath, # 4 Def. Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claims of Plaintiff Robert Heath, # 5 [REDACTED] Declaration of Brian Ong with Exhibit 1 (Placeholder), # 6 Declaration of Brian Ong with Exhibit 1, # 7 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Falcone with Exhibits Nos. 1 - 4 (Placeholders) and Exhibits Nos. 5 and 6, # 8 Exhibits Nos. 1 - 4 to Decl. of Elizabeth Falcone (under seal), # 9 (Proposed) Order Granting Def. Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 12/20/2018 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/5/18. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 404 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Planning call held on 11/5/2018 in advance of 12/20/2018 settlement conference in Oakland (following MSJ hearing in San Jose). Mr. Heath must appear in person, and shall provide the defense with a written demand by 11/19/2018, with a copy to Judge Ryu. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2018)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/25/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 402 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/25/2018 11:01:23 AM ]. File Size [ 6929 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:26 ]. (courtspeak).
October 25, 2018 Filing 401 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/25/2018. The Court Modifies Case Schedule - Last Day to Hear Summary Judgment is set for 12/20/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Motion to be limited to 12 pages, Reply to be limited to 7 pages. Trial Dates remain as set to Plaintiff Heath Only.FTR Time: 11:01 - 11:16. Plaintiff Attorney: Dow Patten, Daniel Kotchen via Courtcall. Defendant Attorney: Brian Berry via Courtcall, Craig Cleland via Courtcall, Thomas McInerney via Courtcall. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/25/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 400 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to individual party Heath and Google that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will convene a pre-settlement conference call to discuss timing and preparation for an in-person settlement conference. Judge Ryu anticipates that the phone call will last approximately 30-45 minutes. The conference call shall take place on 11/5/2018 at 2:30 pm. Lead counsel shall participate. Counsel will receive the call-in information via e-mail from Judge Ryu's courtroom deputy clerk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018) Modified on 10/22/2018 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2018 Filing 399 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google LLC. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 397 PLAINTIFF FILLEKES AND THE OPTIN PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs and Defense counsel may appear telephonically. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/11/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 397 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Appear Telephonically at October 25, 2018 Case Management Conference filed by Cheryl Fillekes. Responses due by 10/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 396 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Further Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 5, 2018 Deadlines and Hearings VACATED in re 395 Order on Stipulation. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER GRANTING 394 STIPULATION TO STAY AND VACATE DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/5/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 394 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying and Vacating Deadlines filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 393 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further telephonic settlement discussions held on 10/5/2018. Parties reached settlement in principle and will make best efforts to file approval papers within 60-90 days. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 392 NOTICE by Google LLC re 368 Order on Motion for Leave to File, REDACTED Order Denying Google's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion to Decertify Collective Action (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 4, 2018 Electronic filing error. Incorrect Event Selected. [err201]. Please re-file in its entirety as Notice. Re: 391 Proposed Order, filed by Google LLC (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018) Modified on 10/5/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2018 Filing 391 *Filing Error* Proposed Order re 368 Order on Motion for Leave to File, REDACTED Order Denying Google's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion to Decertify Collective Action by Google LLC. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 10/3/2018) Modified on 10/4/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER DENYING 379 PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL; LIFTING STAY OF DEADLINE. Motions to Compel due on or before 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/3/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 389 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Settlement Conference held on 10/2/2018. Judge Ryu will hold further telephonic settlement discussions between these parties (i.e., between Defendant and all Plaintiffs except Heath) on 10/5/2018 11:00 AM. See minute Order for more particulars. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/2/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER GRANTING 386 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/1/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 387 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 379 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion(s) to Compel ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Falcone, # 2 Exhibits 1-7 to Declaration of Elizabeth A. Falcone)(Falcone, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 386 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order Continuing Summary Judgment Deadlines filed by Google LLC. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 385 EXHIBITS re 377 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, REDACTED Exhibits Nos. 11 - 41 to Decl. of Berry in support of Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 12, # 3 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 13, # 4 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 14, # 5 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 15, # 6 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 16, # 7 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 17, # 8 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 18, # 9 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 19, # 10 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 20, # 11 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 21, # 12 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 22, # 13 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 23, # 14 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 24, # 15 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 25, # 16 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 26, # 17 REDACTED Exhibits Nos. 27 - 33, # 18 REDACTED Exhibits Nos. 34 - 41)(Related document(s) 377 ) (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER CLARIFYING SCOPE OF DISCOVERY, RE 357 MOTION TO CLARIFY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/27/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER STAYING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/26/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER GRANTING 378 GOOGLE LLCS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO REDACT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/26/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 381 RESPONSE to re 380 Statement of Recent Decision by Cheryl Fillekes. (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 380 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) 357 ) (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 379 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion(s) to Compel filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsey Grunert, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Redact Order Denying Def. Google LLC's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion to Decertify Collection Action filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian D. Berry in support, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Administrative Motion to Redact Order Denying Google LLC's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion to Decertify Collection Action, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Brian D. Berry's Declaration)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 377 OMNIBUS ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 350 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; GRANTING 353 , 359 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/20/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 376 Declaration of BRIAN ONG in Support of 353 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Leave for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Decertification filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) 353 ) (Bowman, Lisa) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 375 Declaration of BRIAN ONG in Support of 350 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Motion for Summary Judgment filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) 350 ) (Bowman, Lisa) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 347 Joint Discovery Letter re Second Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Google LLC. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi re 346 Joint Discovery Letter re Plaintiffs' Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 372 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/18/2018 10:00:41 AM ]. File Size [ 27024 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:56:18 ]. (courtspeak).
September 18, 2018 Filing 371 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi: Discovery Hearing held on 9/18/2018.Counsel present arguments. Matters taken under submission. Court to issue written order.FTR Time: 10:00-10:56. Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Kotchen. Defendant Attorney: Elizabeth Falcone and Thomas McInerney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 370 Declaration of Brian Ong in Support of 359 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) 359 ) (Bowman, Lisa) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 369 *Disregard. See Corrected Version 370 of Declaration Filed Below* Declaration of Brian Ong in Support of 359 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) 359 ) (Bowman, Lisa) (Filed on 9/14/2018) Modified on 9/17/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER RE REDACTION OF 367 ORDER DENYING GOOGLES MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DECERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/13/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 366 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further telephonic settlement discussions held on 9/14/2018. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 367 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL ORDER DENYING GOOGLE'S MOTION 355 FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DECERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION by Court Staff. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC TO FILE DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/13/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 364 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 357 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Clarification or, in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration ) filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Kotchen, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Proposed Order)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER GRANTING 348 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE BY GRUNERT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/11/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER GRANTING 358 APPLICATION OF ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE BY ROLLER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/11/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 361 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will convene a further pre-settlement conference call relating to Fillekes and the class claims only. Judge Ryu anticipates that the phone call will last approximately 20 minutes. The conference call shall take place on 9/14/2018 9:00 AM. Lead Counsel for all parties shall participate. Counsel shall use the call-in information that was previously provided to them by Judge Ryu's courtroom deputy via e-mail on 7/19/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018) Modified on 9/11/2018 (ig, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2018 Filing 360 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 354 MOTION for Reconsideration re 337 Proposed Order , 355 MOTION for Leave to File ) filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 359 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Kotchen, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendant Google LLCs Motion for Leave for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Decertification, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendant Google LLCs Motion for Leave for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Decertification)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 358 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Amy M. Roller ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12666281.) filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Roller, Amy) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 357 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Clarification or, in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 9/14/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Falcone in Support of Google LLC's Motion for Clarification or, in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Falcone, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 356 CLERK'S NOTICE re Discovery Hearings. Please take notice that discovery hearings regarding the parties' Joint Discovery Letter Briefs, Dkt. Nos. 346 and 347 , have been set for 9/18/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 355 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian Berry, # 2 Declaration Exhibit 1 Placeholder, # 3 Declaration Exhibit 2 Placeholder, # 4 Declaration Exhibit 3 Placeholder, # 5 Declaration Exhibit 4 Placeholder, # 6 Proposed Order)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 354 *Filed in Error. See 355 for Corrected Version* MOTION for Reconsideration re 337 Proposed Order filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration Exhibit 1 Placeholder, # 3 Declaration Exhibit 2 Placeholder, # 4 Declaration Exhibit 3 Placeholder, # 5 Declaration Exhibit 4 Placeholder, # 6 Proposed Order)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/7/2018) Modified on 9/11/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2018 Filing 353 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Version of Motion for Leave for Reconsideration, # 3 Unredacted Version of Motion for Leave for Reconsideration, # 4 Under Seal Exhibit 1 to Berry Declaration, # 5 Under Seal Exhibit 2 to Berry Declaration, # 6 Under Seal Exhibit 3 to Berry Declaration, # 7 Under Seal Exhibit 4 to Berry Declaration)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 352 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED] filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/5/2018. Replies due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: # 1 [REDACTED] Declaration of Brian D. Berry in support of Def. Google's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Brian Berry, # 3 Exhibit 2 - PLACE HOLDER, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Parts 1 - 14 - PLACE HOLDER, # 5 Exhibit 3 - PLACE HOLDER, # 6 Exhibit 4 - PLACE HOLDER, # 7 Exhibit 5 - PLACE HOLDER, # 8 Exhibit 6 - PLACE HOLDER, # 9 Exhibit 7 - PLACE HOLDER, # 10 Exhibit 8 to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 11 Exhibit 9 - PLACE HOLDER, # 12 Exhibit 10 - PLACE HOLDER, # 13 Exhibit 11 - PLACE HOLDER, # 14 Exhibit 12 - PLACE HOLDER, # 15 Exhibit 13 - PLACE HOLDER, # 16 Exhibit 14 - PLACE HOLDER, # 17 Exhibit 15 - PLACE HOLDER, # 18 Exhibit 16 - PLACE HOLDER, # 19 Exhibit 17 - PLACE HOLDER, # 20 Exhibit 18 - PLACE HOLDER, # 21 Exhibit 19 - PLACE HOLDER, # 22 Exhibit 20 - PLACE HOLDER, # 23 Exhibit 21 - PLACE HOLDER, # 24 Exhibit 22 - PLACE HOLDER, # 25 Exhibit 23 - PLACE HOLDER, # 26 Exhibit 24 - PLACE HOLDER, # 27 Exhibit 25 - PLACE HOLDER, # 28 Exhibit 26 - PLACE HOLDER, # 29 Exhibit 27 - PLACE HOLDER, # 30 Exhibit 28 - PLACE HOLDER, # 31 Exhibit 29 - PLACE HOLDER, # 32 Exhibit 30 - PLACE HOLDER, # 33 Exhibit 31 - PLACE HOLDER, # 34 Exhibit 32 - PLACE HOLDER, # 35 Exhibit 33 - PLACE HOLDER, # 36 Exhibit 34 - PLACE HOLDER, # 37 Exhibit 35 - PLACE HOLDER, # 38 Exhibit 36 - PLACE HOLDER, # 39 Exhibit 37 - PLACE HOLDER, # 40 Exhibit 38 - PLACE HOLDER, # 41 Exhibit 39 - PLACE HOLDER, # 42 Exhibit 40 - PLACE HOLDER, # 43 Exhibit 41 - PLACE HOLDER, # 44 Declaration Jay De La Torre in support of Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 45 (Proposed) Order Granting Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 351 EXHIBITS re 350 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3 - 41 in support of Brian D. Berry's Declaration in support of Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 2 Exhibit 5 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 3 Exhibit 6 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 4 Exhibit 7 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 5 Exhibit 8 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 6 Exhibit 9 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 7 Exhibit 10 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 8 Exhibit 11 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 9 Exhibit 12 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 10 Exhibit 13 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 11 Exhibit 14 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 12 Exhibit 15 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 13 Exhibit 16 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 14 Exhibit 17 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 15 Exhibit 18 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 16 Exhibit 19 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 17 Exhibit 20 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 18 Exhibit 21 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 19 Exhibit 22 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 20 Exhibit 23 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 21 Exhibit 24 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 22 Exhibit 25 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 23 Exhibit 26 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 24 Exhibits 27 - 33 to Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ, # 25 Exhibits 34 - 41 Brian D. Berry's Decl. iso MSJ)(Related document(s) 350 ) (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 350 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Redacted Version of Def. Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Unredacted Version of Def. Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Redacted Version of Decl. of Brian D. Berry iso Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Unredacted Version of Decl. of Brian D. Berry iso Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 (Under Seal) Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 7 (Under Seal) Exhibit 2 to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 8 Exhibit 2 [Part 1] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 9 Exhibit 2 [Part 2] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 10 Exhibit 2 [Part 3] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 11 Exhibit 2 [Part 4] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 12 Exhibit 2 [Part 5] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 13 Exhibit 2 [Part 6] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 14 Exhibit 2 [Part 7] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 15 Exhibit 2 [Part 8] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 16 Exhibit 2 [Part 9] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 17 Exhibit 2 [Part 10] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 18 Exhibit 2 [Part 11] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 19 Exhibit 2 [Part 12] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 20 Exhibit 2 [Part 13] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 21 Exhibit 2 [Part 14] to Decl. of Brian D. Berry)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 349 NOTICE by Cheryl Fillekes re 342 Order - Certificate of Service Regarding Court Order (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 348 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application of Lindsey Grunert ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12660188.) filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Grunert, Lindsey) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 347 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Second Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Google LLC filed by Google LLC. (Falcone, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 346 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Google LLC. (Falcone, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 343 *REDACTED* ORDER GRANTING 316 , 328 MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR CERTAIN OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/5/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 342 *REDACTED* ORDER DISMISSING NON-RESPONSIVE OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/5/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER RESCHEDULING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (FOR PLAINTIFF FILLIKES AND THE CLASS CLAIMS ONLY): Further Settlement Conference rescheduled to 10/2/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M> Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/4/18. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER GRANTING 339 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY KLEMPERER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/31/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 339 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application of Michael von Klemperer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12644254.) filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (von Klemperer, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 338 NOTICE by Cheryl Fillekes Regarding Pro Hac Vice Applications (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 337 Proposed Order re 334 Order, Terminate Motions, 318 Order, REDACTED Order Denying Motion to Decertify by Google LLC. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 336 NOTICE by Google LLC re 334 Order, Terminate Motions, 318 Order, Notice of Filing of Court's Redacted Order Denying Defendant Google LLC's Motion to Decertify Collective Action (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 16, 2018 Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2018 VACATED re 331 Order. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER RESCHEDULING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (FOR PLAINTIFF FILLIKES AND THE CLASS CLAIMS ONLY): Further Settlement Conference continued to 9/18/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/16/18. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER GRANTING 329 , 330 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REDACT ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S MOTION TO DECERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/14/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER GRANTING 327 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/14/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 332 NOTICE by Cheryl Fillekes re 331 Order - Notice of Compliance with Court's August 10, 2018 Order (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 328 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR CERTAIN OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/10/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 330 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Redact Order filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 329 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REDACT ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S MOTION TO DECERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 8/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 328 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Cheryl Fillekes. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 8/22/2018. Replies due by 8/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsey Grunert, # 2 Proposed Order)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 327 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Movants' Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs and Accompanying Declaration and Proposed Order filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Low, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Certain Opt-Ins, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Certain Opt-Ins, # 5 Redacted Version of Grunert Declaration, # 6 Unredacted Version of Grunert Declaration, # 7 Redacted Version of Proposed Order, # 8 Unredacted Version of Proposed Order)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 326 NOTICE by Cheryl Fillekes re 323 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11, - Certificate of Service Regarding Court Order (Dkt. #323) and Order to Show Cause (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER GRANTING 311 PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; GRANTING 315 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/7/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER GRANTING 314 GOOGLE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY NON-COMPLYING PLAINTIFFS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED; GRANTING 313 GOOGLE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/6/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 322 NOTICE by Cheryl Fillekes re 319 Order - Notice of Compliance with Court's August 1, 2018 Order (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 321 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further telephonic settlement discussions held on 8/2/2018 relating to Fillekes and the class claims only. A further settlement conference is tentatively set for 8/28/2018 10:00 AM for Fillikes/Class claims only. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Hearing Vacated re 319 per ORDER VACATING SEPTEMBER 20, 2018 HEARING ON 316 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR CERTAIN OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 320 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 314 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Requesting Order to Show Cause Why Non-Complying Plaintiffs Should Not Be Dismissed ) filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsey Grunert)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER VACATING SEPTEMBER 20, 2018 HEARING ON 316 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR CERTAIN OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/1/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER RE: REDACTION OF ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S MOTION TO DECERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION. Proposed redactions, if any, are due on or before August 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/1/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 316 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Cheryl Fillekes. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 8/15/2018. Replies due by 8/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsey Grunert, # 2 Proposed Order)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 315 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Movants' Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs and Accompanying Declaration and Proposed Order filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Low, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Movants' Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs, # 4 Unredacted Version of Movants' Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs, # 5 Redacted Version of Grunert Declaration, # 6 Unredacted Version of Grunert Declaration, # 7 Redacted Version of Proposed Order, # 8 Unredacted Version of Proposed Order)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 314 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Requesting Order to Show Cause Why Non-Complying Plaintiffs Should Not Be Dismissed filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 8/6/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted - Administrative Motion Requesting Order to Show Cause Why Non-Complying Plaintiffs Should Not Be Dismissed, # 4 Declaration Redacted, # 5 Proposed Order Redacted, # 6 Administrative Motion Requesting Order to Show Cause Why Non-Complying Plaintiffs Should Not Be Dismissed, # 7 Declaration, # 8 Proposed Order)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 312 NOTICE by Cheryl Fillekes of Voluntary Withdrawal of Consent to Join Forms (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 311 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal of Consent to Join Forms filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Kotchen, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal of Consent to Join Forms, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal of Consent to Join Forms)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 310 CLERK'S NOTICE: Per parties agreement, the further telephonic settlement conference relating to Fillekes and the class claims only previously set for 8/2/2018 11:00 AM has been rescheduled to 8/2/2018 09:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 309 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/12/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Cheryl Fillekes, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 308 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further telephonic settlement discussions relating to Fillekes and the class claims only held on 7/16/2018. Judge Ryu will host a brief (20-30 minute) telephonic settlement call to discuss next steps on 8/2/2018 11:00 AM (the court will provide conference line information to counsel). If counsel for either side has a conflict, please contact Ivy Garcia by 5:00 PM on 7/19/2018 so that the call can be rescheduled. (See minute Order for more particulars). FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 307 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/12/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 306 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/12/2018, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 305 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2018. (Related documents(s) 305 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/12/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 304 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2018 in re 252 MOTION Motion to Decertify Collective Action filed by Google LLC.Parties present oral arguments.The court takes matter under submission; written order to be issued.Total Time in Court: 1:07. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Low, Daniel Kotchen. Defendant Attorney: Thomas McInerney, Anthony Cleland, Brian Berry, Liz Falcone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/12/2018)
June 25, 2018 Filing 303 REPLY (re 252 MOTION Motion to Decertify Collective Action ) REDACTED filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: # 1 REDACTED Declaration of Brian Berry in support thereof)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER GRANTING 300 GOOGLE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/22/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 301 Statement of Non-Opposition to the Assignment of All Further Discovery Matters to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by Cheryl Fillekes. (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 12, 2018 Filing 300 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Version of Reply Memorandum of Law in support of Motion to Decertify Collective Action, # 3 Reply Memorandum of Law in support of Motion to Decertify Collective Action, # 4 Declaration Redacted Version, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 79 to Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 80 to Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 81 to Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 82 to Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 83 to Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 84 to Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 85 to Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 86 to Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 87 to Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 88A to Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 88B to Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 89 to Declaration)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER RE DISCLOSURE. Responses due by 6/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 6/11/2018. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER GRANTING 257 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/11/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi for all further discovery proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 6/7/2018. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 4, 2018 Filing 296 Declaration of Brian Ong in Support of 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) 257 ) (Bowman, Lisa) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 295 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 78. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 294 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 77. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 293 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 76. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 292 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 75. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 291 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 74. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 290 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 73. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 289 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 72. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 288 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 71. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 287 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 70. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 286 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 69. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 285 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 68. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 284 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 67. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 283 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 66. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 282 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 65. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 281 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 64. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 280 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 63. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 279 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 62. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 278 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 61. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 277 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 60. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 276 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 59. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 275 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 58. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 274 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 57. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 273 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 56. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 272 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 55. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 271 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 54. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 270 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 53. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 269 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 52. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 268 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 51. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 267 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 50. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 266 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 49. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 265 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 48. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 264 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 47. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 263 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 46. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 262 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 45. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 261 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, Exhibit 40. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 260 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google LLC. Amendment to 256 Order, . (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 259 EXHIBITS re 258 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Compilation Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Compilation Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Compilation Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Compilation Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Compilation Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Compilation Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 258 ) (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 258 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 252 MOTION Motion to Decertify Collective Action ) filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Kotchen, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Kotchen, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google's Motion to Decertify, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google's Motion to Decertify, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Compilation Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Compilation Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2), # 7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Compilation Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Compilation Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit Redacted Version of Compilation Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Compilation Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit Redacted Version of Compilation Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Compilation Exhibit D, # 13 Exhibit Redacted Version of Compilation Exhibit E, # 14 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Compilation Exhibit E, # 15 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Compilation Exhibit F, # 16 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 17 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 18 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 19 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 20 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, # 21 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, # 22 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 23 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, # 24 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, # 25 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, # 26 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, # 27 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 17, # 28 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, # 29 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 18, # 30 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, # 31 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 19, # 32 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, # 33 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, # 34 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21, # 35 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 22, # 36 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, # 37 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 23, # 38 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 23, # 39 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 24, # 40 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 24, # 41 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 25, # 42 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, # 43 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 CORRECTED ORDER RE: 254 , GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PERSONAL AND COMPENSATION INFORMATION CONTAINED IN OPT-IN DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS AND EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/17/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 255 **DISREGARD --- FILED IN ERROR--- SEE DOCKET ENTRY 256**. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018) Modified on 5/17/2018 (blflc2S, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2018 Filing 254 Declaration of Daniel Kotchen in Support of 253 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. #249) filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Related document(s) 253 ) (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE 249 GOOGLE'S UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/14/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 252 MOTION Motion to Decertify Collective Action filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 5/29/2018. Replies due by 6/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 251 DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. BERRY IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE LLCS MOTION TO DECERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION re 249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Unredacted, # 2 Exhibit 40, # 3 Exhibit 41, # 4 Exhibit 43, # 5 Exhibits 44-78)(Related document(s) 249 ) (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/1/2018) Modified on 5/2/2018 to Conform with Title of Document (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2018 Filing 250 EXHIBITS re 249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17, # 2 Exhibit 18, # 3 Exhibit 19, # 4 Exhibit 20, # 5 Exhibit 21, # 6 Exhibit 22, # 7 Exhibit 23, # 8 Exhibit 24, # 9 Exhibit 25, # 10 Exhibit 26, # 11 Exhibit 27, # 12 Exhibit 28, # 13 Exhibit 29, # 14 Exhibit 30, # 15 Exhibit 31, # 16 Exhibit 32, # 17 Exhibit 33, # 18 Exhibit 34, # 19 Exhibit 35)(Related document(s) 249 ) (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Brief, # 4 Unredacted Version of Brief, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit 11, # 17 Exhibit 12, # 18 Exhibit 13, # 19 Exhibit 14, # 20 Exhibit 15, # 21 Exhibit 16)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER DENYING 247 GOOGLE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/24/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 247 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Brian D. Berry, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Google LLC's Administrative Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits on DeCertification Briefing)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
February 28, 2018 Set Deadlines: Expert Disclosure Exchange (Decert) 3/05/2018. Rebuttal Disclosure Exchange (Decert) 4/02/2018. Decertification Motion 5/01/2018. Opposition to Decertification Motion 5/29/2018. Reply on Decertification Motion 6/12/2018. Expert Disclosure Exchange (Merits) 7/19/2018. Rebuttal Disclosure Exchange (Merits) 8/16/2018. Dispositive Motions due 09/07/2018. Fact and Expert Discovery Cutoff 9/21/2018. Opposition to Dispositive Motions 10/05/2018. Reply on Dispositive Motions 10/19/2018. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/20/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 245 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING DISPUTED DATES ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/13/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 243 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 240 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Schedule CMC ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian D. Berry in support, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Brian D. Berry, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of Brian D. Berry)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 242 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/11/2018, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 239 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2018. (Related documents(s) 239 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE FROM GOOGLE REGARDING PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/8/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 7, 2018 Filing 240 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Schedule CMC filed by Cheryl Fillekes. Responses due by 2/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of D. Kotchen, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Appendix A, # 5 Proposed Order)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 6, 2018 Filing 239 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/11/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 238 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/11/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Cheryl Fillekes, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 237 Defendant Google LLC's ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) byGoogle LLC. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER GRANTING 227 GOOGLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' ADEA DISPARATE IMPACT CLAIM WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/12/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 236 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2018. Total Time in Court: 15 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Kotchen. Defendant Attorney: Brian Berry. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2018)
December 20, 2017 Filing 233 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/11/2017 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Cheryl Fillekes, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 12/20/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2017 Filing 234 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement Conference held on 12/19/2017. Matter did not settle. Counsel agreed to discuss plan for further settlement talks after the holidays. The parties are invited to contact Judge Ryu for further assistance. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2017)
November 8, 2017 Filing 232 REPLY (re 227 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' ADEA Disparate Impact Claim With Prejudice ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 7, 2017 Filing 231 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING as to 227 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' ADEA Disparate Impact Claim With Prejudice. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 230 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 227 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' ADEA Disparate Impact Claim With Prejudice ) filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of D. Kotchen, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER GRANTING 228 STIPULATION TO REFLECT NAME CHANGE FROM GOOGLE INC. TO GOOGLE LLC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/20/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 18, 2017 Filing 228 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reflect Name Change from Google, Inc. to Google LLC filed by Google LLC. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 6, 2017 Filing 227 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' ADEA Disparate Impact Claim With Prejudice filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/1/2017. Replies due by 11/8/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' ADEA Disparate Impact Claim With Prejudice, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 (Proposed) Order Re: Defendant's Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' ADEA Disparate Impact Claim With Prejudice)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER GRANTING 223 STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/22/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 224 Stipulation to continue. Settlement Conference continued to 12/19/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 224 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 166 Order Setting Settlement Conference, Continuing Settlement Conference filed by Google Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 223 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss filed by Google Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 20, 2017 Set Reset Hearing Dates. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 18, 2017 Filing 222 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 11, 2017, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 221 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2017. (Related documents(s) 221 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 12, 2017 Reset Previously Set Hearing Dates: Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 11/15/2018 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2019 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 3/29/2019, 4/1/2019 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 4/1/2019, 4/2/2019, 4/3/2019, 4/4/2019, 4/5/2019, 4/8/2019, 4/9/2019, 4/10/2019, 4/11/2019, 4/12/2019, 4/15/2019, 4/16/2019, 4/17/2019, 4/18/2019, 4/19/2019 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman.(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 12, 2017 Set Hearings re 220 : Last Day to Hear Decertification Motion set for 7/12/2018 09:00 AM. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 11/15/2018 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2019 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 3/29/2019, 4/1/2019 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 4/1/2019, 4/2/2019, 4/3/2019, 4/4/2019, 4/5/2019, 4/8/2019, 4/9/2019, 4/10/2019, 4/11/2019, 4/12/2019, 4/15/2019, 4/16/2019, 4/17/2019, 4/18/2019, 4/19/2019, 4/22/2019, 4/23/2019, 4/24/2019, 4/25/2019, 4/26/2019, 4/29/2019, 5/1/2019, 5/2/2019, and 5/3/2019 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 12, 2017 Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/11/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Google Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/12/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 9/12/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER RE REVISED CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/12/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER RE WITHDRAWAL OF 196 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO BIFURCATE; GRANTING 187 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SAC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/12/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 218 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Google Inc.. Filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 217 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/11/2017.FTR Time: 1:32 - 2:22. Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Low, Daniel Kotchen. Defendant Attorney: Brian Berry, Craig Cleland, Thomas McInerney. This is a text-only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 9/11/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 216 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google Inc.. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
August 31, 2017 Filing 215 REPLY (re 196 MOTION to Bifurcate ) filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 214 MOTION for Leave to File to File Second Amended Complaint - Refiled with Modified Redactions Pursuant to Dkt. #213 filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Proposed Order)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 25, 2017 Reset Case Management Conference re 209 Order. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER RE 211 STIPULATION REGARDING REDACTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SAC AND PROPOSED SAC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/25/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 **DISREGARD CORRECTED BY CLERK** Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 210 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Cheryl Fillekes (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017) Modified on 8/25/2017 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2017 Filing 212 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 196 MOTION to Bifurcate ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 211 STIPULATION re 198 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11, filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted SAC)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 210 UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENTS SOUGHT TO BE SEALED. EXHIBITS re 186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal or, in the alternative, for Leave to File Publicly Stipulation Filed Pursuant to Order 198 filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 186 ) (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 8/24/2017) Modified on 8/25/2017 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/25/2017 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM SEPTEMBER 7, 2017 TO SEPTEMBER 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/24/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 208 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/21/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose.Total Time in Court: 17 Minutes. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Kotchen via Courtcall, Dow Patten via Courtcall, Michael Von Klemperer via Courtcall. Defendant Attorney: Brian Berry via Courtcall, Anthonly Cleland via Courtcall, Thomas McInerney via Courtcall. This is a text-only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER DENYING 195 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/21/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 206 REPLY (re 187 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ) filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 17, 2017 Filing 205 RESPONSE to 195 Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge by Cheryl Fillekes. (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/17/2017) Modified on 8/17/2017 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2017 Filing 204 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 187 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ) Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 203 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Google Inc.. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING 201 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/14/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 201 Joint MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Falcone (Falcone, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 195 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/14/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER RE 186 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO FILE PUBLICLY PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SAC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/14/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER GRANTING 188 190 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL CONSENT FORMS AND NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY WITHDRAWAL OF CONSENT FORMS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/11/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 196 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Cheryl Fillekes. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 8/24/2017. Replies due by 8/31/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 195 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 185 Order on Discovery Letter Brief filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 8/24/2017. Replies due by 8/31/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 8, 2017 Filing 194 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal or, in the alternative, for Leave to File Publicly re 186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal or, in the alternative, for Leave to File Publicly filed by Cheryl Fillekes. Responses due by 8/14/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 193 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal or, in the alternative, for Leave to File Publicly ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian Ong, # 2 Declaration of Thomas M. McInerney)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 192 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 26, 2017, before Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 183 Transcript Order, 184 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 8/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2017. (Related documents(s) 183 , 184 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 191 NOTICE by Cheryl Fillekes of Voluntary Withdrawal of Consent to Join Forms (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Kotchen, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal of Consent to Join Forms, # 4 Unredacted Version of Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal of Consent to Join Forms)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 189 NOTICE by Cheryl Fillekes of Filing of Opt-in Plaintiffs' Consent to Join Forms (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 188 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opt-in Plaintiffs' Consent to Join Forms filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Kotchen, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
August 1, 2017 Filing 187 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Kotchen, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Proposed Order)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
August 1, 2017 Filing 186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal or, in the alternative, for Leave to File Publicly filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Kotchen, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 1, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex. 1, # 7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 2, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex. 2)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 174 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 5. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 27, 2017 Filing 184 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/26/2017 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd by Cheryl Fillekes, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (von Klemperer, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 7/27/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2017 Filing 183 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/26/17 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd by Google Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 7/27/2017)(TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 7/27/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2017 Filing 182 ***FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD***TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/26/2017 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd by Cheryl Fillekes, for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (von Klemperer, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2017) Modified on 7/27/2017 (sp, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2017 Filing 181 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd: Discovery Hearing - Telephonic held on 7/26/2017. Counsel present arguments. Matter taken under submission. Court to issue written order.FTR Time 1:38-2:44. Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Low and Michael VonKlemperer. Defendant Attorney Brian Berry and Thomas McInerney. This is a text-only Minute Entry (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/26/2017)
July 20, 2017 Filing 180 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 14, 2017, before Judge Beth L. Freeman. Transcriber Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 176 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2017. (Related documents(s) 176 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 17, 2017 Filing 179 CLERK'S NOTICE RE TELEPHONIC HEARING RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE JOINT REPORT NO. 5. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT the court will conduct a telephonic hearing re 174 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 5 on 7/26/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel shall arrange for appearance via CourtCall. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 178 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/14/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Cheryl Fillekes, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (von Klemperer, Michael) (Filed on 7/14/2017)(TRANSCRIBER: DIANE SKILLMAN) Modified on 7/14/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2017 Filing 177 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/14/2017. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose.FTR Time: 9:00 - 9:17. Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Kotchen, Michael Von Klemperer. Defendant Attorney: Thomas McInerney, Brian Berry. This is a text-only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 7/14/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 176 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/14/17 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Google Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 7/14/2017)(TRANSCRIBER: DIANE SKILLMAN) Modified on 7/14/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2017 Filing 175 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Google Inc.. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 174 Discovery Letter BriefDiscovery Dispute Joint Report #5 (Regarding Opt-In Discovery) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 173 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/06/2017, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 169 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2017. (Related documents(s) 169 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 9, 2017 Filing 172 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Google Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 7, 2017 Filing 169 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Cheryl Fillekes, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (von Klemperer, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 170 Case Management Conference - Further, Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2017 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 06/06/2017. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 170 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/6/2017.Total Time in Court: 19 minutes. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Low via Courtcall, Michael Von Klemperer via Courtcall. Defendant Attorney: Brian Berry via Courtcall, Craig Cleland via Courtcall, Thomas McInerney via Courtcall. This is a text-only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 168 ***FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD***TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/6/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Cheryl Fillekes, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (von Klemperer, Michael) (Filed on 6/6/2017) Modified on 6/7/2017 (sp, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2017 Filing 167 ***FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD***TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/6/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Google Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 6/6/2017) Modified on 6/7/2017 (sp, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2017 Filing 166 Order Setting Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 10/3/2017 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/1/17. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (granting 164 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/31/2017. Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 164 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Joint Request to Convene Telephonic Case Management Conference filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 22, 2017 Filing 163 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Pre-settlement conference phone call held. The settlement conference tentatively is scheduled for 9/29/2017 10:00 AM in Oakland. The parties shall confirm this date with their clients, and must notify Ivy Garcia (510-637-3639) of any conflict by no later than 5/26/2017 at 5:00 p.m. If a party has a conflict, counsel must meet and confer to identify agreeable dates in the first two weeks of October 2017 and provide those dates to Ms. Garcia by 5/31/2017. If no conflict is identified, the court will issue a scheduling order for 9/29/2017. The parties are invited to contact Judge Ryu for assistance prior to 9/29/2017. FTR Time Not Recorded. Attachment Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/22/2017)
May 5, 2017 Filing 162 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/02/2017, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 11:27 a.m. - 11:33 a.m. = 6 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 157 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 5/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2017. (Related documents(s) 157 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 2, 2017 Filing 161 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/29/2017, before Judge HOWARD R. LLOYD. Court Reporter/Transcriber Victoria L. Valine, CSR, telephone number victoriavalinecsr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 153 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 5/23/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2017. (Related documents(s) 153 ) (vlv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING 154 PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/2/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
May 2, 2017 Filing 159 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/29/2017 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd by Google Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/2/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: VICTORIA VALINE) Modified on 5/2/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2017 Filing 158 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/02/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Google Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/2/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: LEO MANKIEWICZ) Modified on 5/2/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2017 Filing 157 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 2, 2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Cheryl Fillekes, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 4/30/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: LEO MANKIEWICZ) Modified on 5/1/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING 155 JOINT STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER APPROVING ISSUANCE OF OPT-IN NOTICE TO ADDITIONAL INDIVIDUALS, INSERTING A SUPPLEMENTAL OPT-IN PERIOD INTO THE CASE SCHEDULE, AND PERMITTING JOINDER OF THREE ADDITIONAL OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/25/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 155 JOINT STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER APPROVING ISSUANCE OF OPT-IN NOTICE TO ADDITIONAL INDIVIDUALS, INSERTING A SUPPLEMENTAL OPT-IN PERIOD INTO CASE SCHEDULE, AND PERMITTING JOINDER OF THREE ADDITIONAL OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS and (Proposed) Order filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Placeholder))(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 4/25/2017) Modified on 4/25/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2017 Filing 154 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Additional Consent to Join Forms filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 21, 2017 Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 29, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd by Cheryl Fillekes, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. TRANSCRIBER: Victoria Valine. (von Klemperer, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2017) Modified on 5/1/2017 (sp, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING 150 PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/18/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
April 11, 2017 Filing 151 NOTICE OF FILING OF CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS by Cheryl Fillekes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 4/11/2017) Text modified on 4/12/2017 conforming to posted document caption (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2017 Filing 150 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opt-in Plaintiffs' Consent to Join Forms filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 149 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will convene a pre-settlement conference call to discuss timing and preparation for an in-person settlement conference. Judge Ryu anticipates that the phone call will last approximately 30-45 minutes. The conference call shall take place on 5/22/2017 10:00 AM. Counsel for all parties shall participate. Counsel will receive the call-in information via e-mail from Judge Ryu's Courtroom Deputy. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RYU FOR SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/3/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
March 30, 2017 Filing 147 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Tamara Lange on 3/30/2017. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 29, 2017 Filing 146 Order Clarifying 130 Order re Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/29/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 29, 2017 Filing 145 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd: Discovery Hearing - Telephonic held on 3/29/2017. Hearing held. FTR Time 2:10-2:20. Plaintiff Attorney Dow Patten. Defendant Attorney Brian Berry and Thomas McInerney. This is a text only Minute Entry (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/29/2017)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING 143 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (as to Michael Brown). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/27/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 24, 2017 Filing 143 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL BROWN TO APPEAR IN PRO HAC VICE OVIL LOCAL RULE 11-3); and (Proposed) order ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 261FGBOS.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/24/17 filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brown, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2017) Modified on 3/27/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2017 Filing 142 Letter from Thomas M. McInerney . (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 139 Setting Telephonic Hearing re Compliance with Discovery Order. Telephonic hearing set for 3/29/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel to arrange for appearance via CourtCall. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 23, 2017 Filing 140 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, March 30, 2017, at 1:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 21, 2017 Filing 139 MOTION for Hearing - Request for Telephonic Case Management Conference Before Magistrate Judge Lloyd filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER DENYING 136 DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO CLARIFY DISCOVERY ORDER AND TERMINATING 137 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ADVANCE HEARING DATE AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/9/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 8, 2017 Filing 137 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Advance Hearing Date on Defendant Google Inc.s Motion to Clarify Discovery Order or, in the Alternative, for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 136 MOTION to clarify Discovery Order or, in the Alternative, for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Discovery Order re gHire Data Production) re 130 Order on Discovery Letter Brief, filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 3/13/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
March 8, 2017 Filing 136 MOTION to clarify Discovery Order or, in the Alternative, for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Discovery Order re gHire Data Production) re 130 Order on Discovery Letter Brief, filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 3/22/2017. Replies due by 3/29/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 134 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 03/07/2017. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
March 2, 2017 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/2/2017. Case Management Order to be issued. FTR Time: 11:27 11:33. Plaintiff Attorney: Dow Patten/Telephonic Appearance: Daniel Low. Defendant Attorney: Telephonic Appearances: Thomas McInerney, Brain Berry. This is a text only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/2/2017)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING 132 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION ALLOWING THE PARTIES TOAPPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/24/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 24, 2017 Filing 132 Joint MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 131 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 101 Amended Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1; 100 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER APPROVING 128 JOINT SUBMISSION REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/11/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 9, 2017 Filing 128 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Submission Regarding Case Schedule filed by Google Inc.. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
December 13, 2016 Filing 127 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING DATES. Case Management Statement due by 2/23/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2017 11:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2018 01:30 PM. Last Day to Hear Decertification Motion set for 01/18/2018 at 9:00 AM. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 06/28/2019 at 9:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2018 at 1:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 11/26/2018 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 11/26/2018, 11/27/2018, 11/28/2018, 11/29/2018, 11/30/2018, 12/3/2018, 12/4/2018, 12/5/2018, 12/6/2018 and 12/7/2018 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 13, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions 06/28/2018 9:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2018 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 11/26/2018 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 11/26/2018, 11/27/2018, 11/28/2018, 11/29/2018, 11/30/2018, 12/3/2018, 12/4/2018, 12/5/2018, 12/6/2018 and 12/7/2018 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER (1) APPROVING OPT-IN NOTICE FORM AND (2) MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/12/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 6, 2016 Filing 125 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Opt-In Notice and Proposed Case Schedule) filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 124 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/06/2016 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Google Inc., for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 123 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 6, 2016, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 122 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 11/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2017. (Related documents(s) 122 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
October 13, 2016 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/6/2016 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Cheryl Fillekes, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 10/13/2016) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 10/13/2016 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD ON OCTOBER 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/7/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 120 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/6/2016.FTR Time: 3:31 - 4:31. Plaintiff Attorney: Dow Patten, Daniel Kotchen. Defendant Attorney: Brain Barry, Craig Cleland. This is a text only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/6/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 REDACTED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF CHERYL FILLEKES MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION AND DENYING PLAINTIFF ROBERT HEATHS PARTIAL JOINDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Granting in part and Denying in part 107 Motion to Certify Class. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is: Joint Case Management Statement. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 117 Case Management Statement filed by Cheryl Fillekes (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 117 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 116 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/22/2016, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 113 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2017. (Related documents(s) 113 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/30/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 28, 2016 Filing 114 Statement Defendant's Supplemental Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Google Inc.. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 26, 2016 Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/22/2016 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Google Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 22, 2016 Filing 112 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/22/2016.Total Time in Court: 07 Minutes. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Dow Patten, Daniel Kotchen. Defendant Attorney: Brian Berry, A. Craig Cleland. This is a text only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 9/22/2016)
September 22, 2016 Filing 111 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2016 re 107 Amended MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally for Collective Action - Refiled with modified redactions per August 17, 2016 Order on Motions to Seal filed by Cheryl Fillekes. The Court takes the matter under submission. Written order to be issued. Total Time in Court: 9:47 - 10:15. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Dow Patten, Daniel Kotchen. Defendant Attorney: Brian Berry, A. Craig Cleland. This is a text only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 9/22/2016)
September 16, 2016 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is: Joint Case Management Statement. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 110 Case Management Statement filed by Google Inc. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 15, 2016 Filing 110 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Google Inc.. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 9/15/2016) Modified on 9/16/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DENYING 85 DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/12/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
August 25, 2016 Filing 108 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF CHERYL FILLEKES MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION (ECF 75) AND PLAINTIFF ROBERT HEATHS PARTIAL JOINDER (ECF 78 (re 75 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Google Inc. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 8/25/2016) Modified on 8/25/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2016 Filing 107 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) filed by Cheryl Fillekes. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 7/13/2016. Replies due by 7/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 13, # 4 Exhibit 14)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2016) Text modified on 8/25/2016 conforming to posted document (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing re 106 Order Vacating Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Strike. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 85 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/19/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER REGARDING 74 , 94 , 102 SEALING MOTIONS PERTAINING TO MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/17/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
August 12, 2016 Filing 104 REPLY (re 75 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally for Collective Action - REDACTED ) filed byRobert Heath. (Patten, Dow) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
August 12, 2016 Filing 103 REPLY (re 75 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally for Collective Action - REDACTED ) filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
August 12, 2016 Filing 102 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Conditional Certification filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Low Decl., # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Reply, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Reply)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
August 9, 2016 Filing 101 Discovery Letter Brief Amended Joint Report #1 Regarding Plaintiffs' RFP 6, 9, & 11 filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
August 9, 2016 Filing 100 Discovery Letter BriefJOINT REPORT # 2 REGARDING THE PRODUCTION OF GHIRE DATA filed by Cheryl Fillekes, Robert Heath. (Patten, Dow) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 99 REPLY (re 85 MOTION to Strike 75 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally for Collective Action - REDACTED, 78 Joinder, DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF CHERYL FILLEKES' UNTIMELY MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION O ) DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF CHERYL FILLEKES' UNTIMELY MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION, PLAINTIFF ROBERT HEATH'S UNTIMELY JOINDER, AND PLAINTIFFS' COLLECTIVE ACTION ALLEGATIONS filed byGoogle Inc.. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING 97 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND REPLY DEADLINE TO CONFORM WITH SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/3/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
August 3, 2016 Filing 97 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Reply Deadline to Conform With Scheduling Order filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 96 RESPONSE (re 75 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally for Collective Action - REDACTED ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian Berry, # 2 Declaration of Kara Silverstein, # 3 Declaration of Brian Ong)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 95 EXHIBITS re 94 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 (part 1 of 2) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 2 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 (part 2 of 2) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6 (part 1 of 2) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6 (part 2 of 2) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7 to Brian Ong Declaration, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8 (part 1 of 2) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8 (part 2 of 2) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9 (part 1 of 2) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9 (part 2 of 2) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10 to Brian Ong Declaration, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11 to Brian Ong Declaration, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12 to Brian Ong Declaration)(Related document(s) 94 ) (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 94 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Opposition Brief, # 4 Unredacted Version of Opposition Brief, # 5 Redacted Version of Brian Ong Declaration, # 6 Unredacted Version of Brian Ong Declaration, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 (part 1 of 2) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 (part 2 of 2) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to Brian Ong Declaration, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3 (part 1 of 3) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3 (part 2 of 3) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3 (part 3 of 3) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4 (part 1 of 2) to Brian Ong Declaration, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4 (part 2 of 2) to Brian Ong Declaration)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DENYING 65 PLAINTIFF ROBERT HEATH'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/29/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 27, 2016 Filing 92 Joinder re 91 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Robert Heath. (Patten, Dow) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 27, 2016 Filing 91 RESPONSE (re 85 MOTION to Strike 75 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally for Collective Action - REDACTED, 78 Joinder, DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF CHERYL FILLEKES' UNTIMELY MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION O ) filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING 89 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING ENLARGEMENT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S OPPOSITION BRIEF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/22/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 22, 2016 Filing 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING ENLARGEMENT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S OPPOSITION BRIEF filed by Google Inc.. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 18, 2016 Reset Motion Hearing as to 75 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally for Collective Action - REDACTED. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2016 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 87 Case Management Conference - Further, Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2016 11:00 AM. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 1/26/2017 at 9:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2017 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 6/5/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 6/5/2017, 6/6/2017, 6/7/2017, 6/8/2017, 6/9/2017, 6/12/2017, 6/13/2017, 6/14/2017, 6/15/2017, and 6/16/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 07/18/2016. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 18, 2016 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/18/2016.FTR Time: 1:33 - 2:07. Plaintiff Attorney: Dow Patten, Daniel Kothcen, Michael Von Klemperer. Defendant Attorney: Brian Berry, Craig Cleland. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 7/18/2016)
July 14, 2016 Filing 86 Declaration of Brian D. Berry in Support of 85 MOTION to Strike 75 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally for Collective Action - REDACTED, 78 Joinder, DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF CHERYL FILLEKES' UNTIMELY MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION O filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 85 ) (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 14, 2016 Filing 85 MOTION to Strike 75 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally for Collective Action - REDACTED, 78 Joinder, DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF CHERYL FILLEKES' UNTIMELY MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION (ECF 75), PLAINTIFF ROBERT HEATH'S UNTIMELY JOINDER (ECF 78), AND PLAINTIFFS' COLLECTIVE ACTION ALLEGATIONS filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 7/28/2016. Replies due by 8/4/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 13, 2016 Set Case Management Conference re 84 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2016 01:30 PM. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER REGARDING 81 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/12/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
July 11, 2016 Filing 83 RESPONSE (re 81 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Telephonic Case Management Conference ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING 76 DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY DOCKETED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/6/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
July 5, 2016 Filing 81 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Telephonic Case Management Conference filed by Cheryl Fillekes. Responses due by 7/11/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Affidavit, # 6 Proposed Order)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
July 5, 2016 Filing 80 Declaration of Brian Ong in Support of 74 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Conditional Certification and Exhibits 1-5, 8, and 13-19 DECLARATION OF BRIAN ONG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CHERYL FILLEKES' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
July 5, 2016 Filing 79 RESPONSE (re 76 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY DOCKETED BRIEFING SCHEDULE TO CONFORM WITH THE SCHEDULING ORDER re 75 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally for Collective Action - REDACTED ) filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
July 1, 2016 Filing 78 Joinder re 75 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally for Collective Action - REDACTED [PARTIAL JOINDER] by Robert Heath. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Robert Heath, # 2 Declaration Dow W. Patten, # 3 Proposed Order)(Patten, Dow) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
July 1, 2016 Filing 77 Declaration of Brian D. Berry in Support of 76 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY DOCKETED BRIEFING SCHEDULE TO CONFORM WITH THE SCHEDULING ORDER re 75 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally for Collective Action - REDACTED filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 76 ) (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
July 1, 2016 Filing 76 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY DOCKETED BRIEFING SCHEDULE TO CONFORM WITH THE SCHEDULING ORDER re 75 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally for Collective Action - REDACTED filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 7/5/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berry, Brian) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 29, 2016 Filing 75 PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NUMBER 107 FOR CORRECTION. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) filed by Cheryl Fillekes. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 7/13/2016. Replies due by 7/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - placeholder, # 2 Exhibit 2 - placeholder, # 3 Exhibit 3 - placeholder, # 4 Exhibit 4 - placeholder, # 5 Exhibit 5 - placeholder, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8 - placeholder, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13 - placeholder, # 14 Exhibit 14 - placeholder, # 15 Exhibit 15 - placeholder, # 16 Exhibit 16 - placeholder, # 17 Exhibit 17 - placeholder, # 18 Exhibit 18 - placeholder, # 19 Exhibit 19 - placeholder, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21 - Proposed Notice, # 22 Declaration Low Declaration in Support of Motion, # 23 Proposed Order)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 6/29/2016) Modified on 6/29/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/30/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2016 Filing 74 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Conditional Certification and Exhibits 1-5, 8, and 13-19 filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Motion for Conditional Certification, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, # 11 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, # 12 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, # 13 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, # 14 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, # 15 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, # 16 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 23, 2016 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 6/23/2016. re 65 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Robert Heath. The Court takes the matter under submission. Written order to be issued. Total Time in Court: 20 minutes. Court Reporter Name: Irene Rodriguez. Plaintiff Attorney: Don Watten, Daniel Low. Defendant Attorney: Brian Berry. This is a text only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 6/23/2016)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING 71 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/22/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 22, 2016 Filing 71 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Motion Hearing filed by Cheryl Fillekes. Responses due by 6/27/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
May 17, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing re 69 Order (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 16, 2016 Filing 70 REPLY (re 65 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ) filed byRobert Heath. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Dow W. Patten)(Patten, Dow) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE ON CONDITIONAL COLLECTIVE ACTION CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/16/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Thomas M. McInerney in Opposition to 65 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint DECLARATION OF THOMAS M. MCINERNEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF ROBERT HEATH'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 65 ) (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 67 RESPONSE (re 65 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ) DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF ROBERT HEATH'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byGoogle Inc.. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 9, 2016 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correction event is: Statement of Non-opposition. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 66 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Cheryl Fillekes (srn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 66 Statement of Non-Opposition (re 65 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ) filed byCheryl Fillekes. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 5/9/2016) Modified on 5/9/2016 (srn, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing as to 65 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
April 25, 2016 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Robert Heath. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Dow W. Patten, # 2 Proposed Order)(Patten, Dow) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Brian Davis Berry and Notice of Appearance (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING 52 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/18/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 55 , 56 , 57 , 58 Discovery Dispute Joint Report Nos. 1-4. DDJRs denied without prejudice. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 60 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/22/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 22, 2016 Filing 60 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice attorney Daniel Kotchen on behalf of Plaintiff Cheryl Fillekes ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10232626.) filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Kotchen, Daniel) (Filed on 2/22/2016) Modified on 2/22/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by George S. Duesdieker NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF CHERYL FILLEKES (Duesdieker, George) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 19, 2016 Filing 58 Joint Discovery Letter Brief #4 - Regarding Google's Redaction of Produced Documents filed by Cheryl Fillekes, Robert Heath. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 19, 2016 Filing 57 Joint Discovery Letter Brief #3 - Regarding Plaintiffs' Noticed Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Cheryl Fillekes, Robert Heath. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 19, 2016 Filing 56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief #2 - Regarding Google's Interrogatory Response filed by Cheryl Fillekes, Robert Heath. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 19, 2016 Filing 55 Joint Discovery Letter Brief#1 - Regarding Google's Production of Documents filed by Cheryl Fillekes, Robert Heath. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 2/18/2016 re 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Robert Heath filed by Robert Heath. The Court takes the matter under submission. Total Time in Court: 7 minutes. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Low. Defendant Attorney: Anthony Cleland, Jill V. Cartwright. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 2/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING 42 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF ROBERT HEATH. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/18/2016.(blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Scheduling Order filed by Cheryl Fillekes. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 12, 2016 Filing 51 REPLY (re 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Robert Heath ) filed byCheryl Fillekes, Robert Heath. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 50 RESPONSE (re 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Robert Heath ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jill V. Cartwright)(Cartwright, Jill) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 49 Statement of Non-Opposition re 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Robert Heath filed byRobert Heath. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Patten, Dow) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE by Cheryl Fillekes Plaintiff Cheryl Fillekes' Consent to Join Collective Action (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE by Robert Heath PLAINTIFF ROBERT HEATH'S CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Patten, Dow) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Dow Wakefield Patten (Patten, Dow) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 44 MOTION AND STIPULATION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY; COUNSEL TO ARRANGE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE VIA COURTCALL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/1/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
February 1, 2016 Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 43 Order, 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Robert Heath to appear telephonically at motion hearing filed by Robert Heath. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 25, 2016 ECF calendar updated, re 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney: motion hearing advanced to 2/18/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON 42 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF ROBERT HEATH. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/25/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Robert Heath filed by Robert Heath. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 2/5/2016. Replies due by 2/12/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 39 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXTEND SCHEDULING DEADLINES AND (2) SETTING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/8/2015. blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 40 RESPONSE (re 39 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Order Deadlines ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jill V. Cartwright)(Cartwright, Jill) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 39 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Robert Heath. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 37 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR THE TREATMENT OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION filed by Google Inc.. (Cartwright, Jill) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARINGS re: Order ( 35 ) Hearing on Conditional Collective Action Certification set for 03/17/2016 at 9:00 AM. Hearing on Motion to Decertify any Conditionally Certified Collective Action set for 03/09/2017 at 9:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING AS AMENDED BY THE COURT 33 STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/30/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 25, 2015 Filing 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 31 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Google Inc.. (Cartwright, Jill) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 25, 2015 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed by Google Inc.. (Cartwright, Jill) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 30 Case Management Conference - Initial, Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 01/26/2017 at 9:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2017 01:30 AM. Jury Selection set for 5/1/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 5/1/2017, 5/2/2017, 5/3/2017, 5/5/2017, 5/8/2017, 5/09/2017, 5/10/2017, 5/12/2017, 5/15/2017, 5/16/2017, 5/17/2017, and 5/19/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 09/10/2015. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Status Conference held on 9/10/2015. FTR Time: 1:44 - 1:52. Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Low. Defendant Attorney: Craig Cleland, Thomas McInerney. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2015)
September 3, 2015 Filing 29 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Robert Heath. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO VACATE MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/12/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 11, 2015 Filing 27 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 09/03/2015. Case Management Conference set for 09/10/2015 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, U.S. District Court 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113. ***THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY*** (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
August 11, 2015 Filing 26 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 09/03/2015. Case Management Conference set for 09/10/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, U.S. District Court 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113. ***THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY*** (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
August 11, 2015 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and to Vacate Motion to Dismiss Hearing Date filed by Google Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 23 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for all Plaintiffs (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
July 29, 2015 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byGoogle Inc.. (Cartwright, Jill) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-1. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/10/2015. (blflc3, COURT STAF) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Google Inc.. (Cartwright, Jill) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc.. Filed byRobert Heath. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 11, 2015 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 FRCP 7.1 Disclosure)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 11, 2015 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 6/25/2015. Replies due by 7/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 4, 2015 Filing 15 Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman granting 14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 4, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9573230.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cleland, Anthony) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
May 21, 2015 Filing 13 Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman granting 12 Stipulation. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 21, 2015 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Google Inc.. (Cartwright, Jill) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Robert Heath (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 11, 2015 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Heath as to Google, Inc. on May 7, 2015 (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 08/13/2015. Case Management Conference set for 08/20/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 5/6/2015. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
May 6, 2015 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
May 6, 2015 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Heath.. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Google Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 22, 2015 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/11/2015. Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 22, 2015 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 22, 2015 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Low, Daniel) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 22, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Age Discrimination in Employment against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9464839.). Filed byRobert Heath. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Low, Daniel) (Filed on 4/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Heath v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Jill Vogt Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Heath
Represented By: Daniel Lee Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?