First Financial Security, Inc. v. Freedom Equity Group, LLC

Plaintiff: First Financial Security, Inc.
Defendant: Freedom Equity Group, LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv01893
Filed: April 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2017 179 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 176 Request for Judicial Notice signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/14/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
August 21, 2017 175 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 148 Motion for New Trial; denying 171 Administrative Motion. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
November 30, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re: Dkt. No. 89 , Motion for Attorneys' Fees. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 18, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 92 Motion in Limine #1. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
October 7, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part 70 Motion for Sanctions. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
June 28, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court Interim Order on 70 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/28/16. (hrllc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
May 26, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 42 Motion to Strike. (hrllc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
April 5, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 41 motion to strike counterclaim. (hrllc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
January 20, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 50 request to hold a conference call and compel discovery. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
September 22, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Financial Security, Inc. v. Freedom Equity Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Financial Security, Inc.
Represented By: Clifford Scott Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Equity Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?