Fontes v. Autocom Networks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Fontes
Defendant: Autocom Networks, Inc., Autocom Power, LLC, M&M Automotive Group, Inc., Michael P. Murphy, Nissan North America Inc, Jose Perez and TDK Trust Dated January 23, 1995
Case Number: 5:2015cv02044
Filed: May 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/15/2015. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue dates and initial case management conference filed by Jose Perez, Autocom Power, LLC, Autocom Networks, Inc., Nissan North America Inc. Case Management Stateme nt due by 2/26/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 3/4/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco, Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/22/2015. In the event a dismissal of the entire action is not filed by 1/212/2016, all defendants which have not been dismissed from the action shall file a responsive pleading by that date.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 30 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Daniel Fontes. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/14/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER, granting 28 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by TDK Trust Dated January 23, 1995 Continuing Dates filed by TDK Trust Dated January 23, 1995. Case referred to Private ADR. Responsive pleading due by 10/23/2015. Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/28/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontes v. Autocom Networks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Fontes
Represented By: Rosaclaire Baisinger
Represented By: Brooke Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autocom Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autocom Power, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&M Automotive Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDK Trust Dated January 23, 1995
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?