Johnson v. El Cerrito Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Michael C. Johnson
Defendant: El Cerrito Police Department, Chi Lee and Mario Guzman
Case Number: 5:2015cv02207
Filed: May 15, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Contra Costa
Referring Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING by Judge William Alsup granting 64 Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2018 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 23, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (11/13/2017) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (11/1/2017). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/23/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
November 17, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 44 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR MEDIATION, Motions terminated: 39 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/17/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. El Cerrito Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Cerrito Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?