Kimberly Cox v. Old Republic National Title Insurance Company, et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly Cox
Defendant: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company, New Penn Financial, LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWMBS Inc - CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2005-02 and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv02253
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2016 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
April 5, 2016 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 103 PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE RULE 26 REQUIREMENTS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2016. Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2016 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/5/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
January 25, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 90 PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2016 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/25/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
August 17, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/17/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 7, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER REGARDING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; TERMINATING PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT. This order withdraws and replaces 41 . Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/7/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 5, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 40 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; TERMINATING PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT, re: 27 , 33 , 35 . Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/5/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
June 15, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CEASE AND DESIST FORECLOSURE DURING THE PENDENCY OF THIS ACTION, re: 20 . The 8/20/2015 preliminary injunction hearing is VACATED. The Initial Case Management Conference and associated deadlines remain on calendar. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 6/15/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimberly Cox v. Old Republic National Title Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Penn Financial, LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWMBS Inc - CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2005-02
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Pinch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cox
Represented By: Ronald Henry Freshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?