The Richard Musgrave Bypass Trust, by Harry D. Krause, Trustee v. Musgrave et al

Plaintiff: The Richard Musgrave Bypass Trust, by Harry D. Krause, Trustee
Defendant: Peggy B Musgrave, Pamela J Clyne, Dennis R Book and Book & Book, LLP
Case Number: 5:2015cv02280
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS BOOK AND BOOK & BOOK, LLP WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 19, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 3, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 3, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
November 10, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 16 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
October 29, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 29, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Richard Musgrave Bypass Trust, by Harry D. Krause, Trustee v. Musgrave et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Richard Musgrave Bypass Trust, by Harry D. Krause, Trustee
Represented By: Thomas W Krause
Represented By: Robert E. Temmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy B Musgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela J Clyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis R Book
Represented By: James Samuel Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Book & Book, LLP
Represented By: James Samuel Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?