Winns v. Merit Systems Protection Board et al

Plaintiff: Harris L. Winns
Defendant: Merit Systems Protection Board, Megan Brennan and U.S. Postal Service
Case Number: 5:2015cv02313
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd certifying appeal is not taken in good faith and denying 55 motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. (hrllc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
October 30, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 21 motion for leave to file second amended complaint; order transferring case to Federal Circuit; order denying as moot 27 motion for intra-district venue change and 16 motion to dismiss. (hrllc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
June 24, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/24/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winns v. Merit Systems Protection Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris L. Winns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merit Systems Protection Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?