Meza v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Plaintiff: Jovita Meza
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv02320
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/11/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016) **THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE CASE FILE** Modified on 3/11/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/8/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 3, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/3/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
January 15, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 28 granting Lowe's Request to Appear by Telephone filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Signed by Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 1/15/2016. **Defendant must finalize his/her appearance through CourtCall** (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
September 24, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 24, 2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 16, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 6 Motion to Remand (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meza v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jovita Meza
Represented By: Matt Reid Leal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Brian J Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?