Absyed v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Munis Ghanni Absyed
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2015cv02328
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 23 , denying the defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment 26 , and remanding the case for further proceedings. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE re 8 , 10 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Munis Ghanni Absyed. As all parties have consented to the assignment of this case to a magistrate judge for all purposes in cluding trial and entry of judgment (see Docket Item Nos. 8, 10), the Clerk shall reassign it to an available magistrate judge according to the relevant portions of this District's assignment plan. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/20/2016.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: CONSENT/DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. In order to determine the position of both parties on this issue, the court orders Plaintiff to file a similar document indicating either his consent or declination to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge on or before January 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/13/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Absyed v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Munis Ghanni Absyed
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?